EP1803878 - Decompression closure [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.08.2013 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.09.2013 [2013/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states S-Fasteners GmbH Im Unteren Ried 7 75382 Althengstett / DE | [2011/28] |
Former [2007/27] | For all designated states S-Fasteners GmbH Rudolf-Diesel-Strasse 2 71106 Magstadt / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Homner, Bernhard Riegeläcker Strasse 75 75365 Calw-Stammheim / DE | [2007/27] | Representative(s) | Borchert, Uwe Rudolf Puschmann Borchert Bardehle Patentanwälte Partnerschaft Postfach 10 12 31 80086 München / DE | [2013/08] |
Former [2013/02] | Kirschner, Klaus Dieter Puschmann Borchert Bardehle Patentanwälte Partnerschaft Postfach 10 12 31 80086 München / DE | ||
Former [2012/39] | Blutke, Klaus Wilhelm Schafgasse 1 71032 Böblingen / DE | ||
Former [2007/27] | Blutke, Klaus Wilhelm Schafgasse 1 71032 Böblingen / DE | Application number, filing date | 06026132.8 | 16.12.2006 | [2007/27] | Priority number, date | DE20052020308U | 27.12.2005 Original published format: DE 202005020308 U | [2007/27] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1803878 | Date: | 04.07.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/27] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1803878 | Date: | 01.12.2010 | [2010/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1803878 | Date: | 26.09.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.11.2010 | Classification | IPC: | E05B51/02, B64C1/18, E05C5/02 | [2012/04] | CPC: |
E05B51/023 (EP,US);
B64C1/18 (EP,US);
E05C5/02 (EP,US);
B64C2001/009 (EP,US);
E05B63/0052 (EP,US);
Y10S292/65 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2007/27] | E05C19/02 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2011/32] |
Former [2007/27] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Dekompressionsverschluss | [2007/27] | English: | Decompression closure | [2007/27] | French: | Fermeture de décompression | [2007/27] | Examination procedure | 13.05.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.05.2011 | Examination requested [2011/25] | 02.06.2011 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 08.07.2011 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 23.08.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.11.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.02.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.02.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 24.02.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 27.07.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.08.2011 | Opposition(s) | 27.06.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/36] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent | 15.08.2012 | Request for further processing filed | 15.08.2012 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 27.08.2012 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE3922025 ; | [ID]EP0784141 (SCHWARZ VERBINDUNGS SYS GMBH [DE]); | [I]DE10040410 (SCHWARZ VERBINDUNGS SYS GMBH [DE]) | by applicant | DE3922025 | EP0784141 | DE10040410 |