EP1800945 - Cargo door for vehicles, trailers and semi-trailers [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 10.04.2012 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.04.2012 | Refusal of application | published on 09.05.2012 [2012/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ITALPLAST S.r.L. Via Nuova 614 47032 Bertinoro FO / IT | [2007/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Zanelli, Lorenzo Via Reneto Medri, 2031 47020 Cesena (Forli) / IT | [2007/26] | Representative(s) | Lunati, Vittoriano Lunati & Mazzoni S.r.l. Via Carlo Pisacane, 36 20129 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2007/26] | Lunati, Vittoriano LUNATI & MAZZONI S.R.L. Via Carlo Pisacane, 36 20129 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 06026176.5 | 18.12.2006 | [2007/26] | Priority number, date | IT2005MI02416 | 20.12.2005 Original published format: IT MI20052416 | [2007/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1800945 | Date: | 27.06.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/26] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1800945 | Date: | 25.06.2008 | [2008/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.05.2008 | Classification | IPC: | B60P1/43, B60J5/10 | [2007/26] | CPC: |
B60J5/108 (EP);
B60P1/435 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/26] | Title | German: | Frachttür für Kraftfahrzeuge, Anhänger und Sattelauflieger | [2007/26] | English: | Cargo door for vehicles, trailers and semi-trailers | [2007/26] | French: | Porte de cargo pour véhicules, remorques et semi-remorques | [2007/26] | Examination procedure | 29.09.2008 | Examination requested [2008/46] | 30.10.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.05.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.02.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.06.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.12.2011 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 13.03.2012 | 13.12.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2012/19] | 23.12.2011 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2012/19] | 13.03.2012 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 30.10.2008 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2011 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO0227129 (RAMPDOORS LTD [GB], et al) [X] 1,2 * page 9; figure 15 *; | [X]GB2372482 (RUMSEY JOHN PHILLIP [GB], et al) [X] 1,2* page 2; figure 4 *; | [X]GB2401394 (WIETMARSCHER AMBULANZ UND SOND [DE]) [X] 1-8 * page 6, lines 4-27; figure 3 *; | [X]CA2466619 (JAGER WILLEM [CA]) [X] 1-4,6,7 * paragraphs [0043] - [0047]; figures 7,8 * |