EP1802166 - Speaker device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 28.09.2007 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.10.2009 | Change - representative | published on 25.11.2009 [2009/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pioneer Corporation 4-1 Meguro 1-chome, Meguro-ku Tokyo 153-8654 / JP | For all designated states Tohoku Pioneer Corporation 1105, Aza Nikko, Oaza Kunomoto Tendo-shi Yamagata 994-8585 / JP | [2007/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Takayama, Koji c/o Tohoku Pioneer Corporation 1105 Aza Nikko Oaza-Kunomoto Tendo Yamagata, 994-8585 / JP | 02 /
Yuse, Kazuki c/o Tohoku Pioneer Corporation 1105 Aza Nikko Oaza-Kunomoto Tendo Yamagata, 994-8585 / JP | 03 /
Kobayashi, Hiroyuki c/o Tohoku Pioneer Corporation 1105 Aza Nikko Oaza-Kunomoto Tendo Yamagata, 994-8585 / JP | 04 /
Hayasaka, Shinichi c/o Tohoku Pioneer Corporation 1105 Aza Nikko Oaza-Kunomoto Tendo Yamagata, 994-8585 / JP | [2007/26] | Representative(s) | Popp, Eugen, et al Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/48] | Popp, Eugen, et al Meissner, Bolte & Partner GbR Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/34] | Popp, Eugen, et al MEISSNER, BOLTE & PARTNER Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/26] | Popp, Eugen, et al Meissner, Bolte & Partner GbR Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06026343.1 | 19.12.2006 | [2007/26] | Priority number, date | JP20050373233 | 26.12.2005 Original published format: JP 2005373233 | [2007/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1802166 | Date: | 27.06.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/26] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1802166 | Date: | 08.08.2007 | [2007/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.07.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H04R9/02 | [2007/26] | CPC: |
H04R9/025 (EP,US);
H04R2209/022 (EP,US);
H04R2209/024 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/26] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Lautsprechereinrichtung | [2007/26] | English: | Speaker device | [2007/26] | French: | Dispositif de haut-parleur | [2007/26] | Examination procedure | 20.09.2007 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2007/44] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]SU711704 (MELNIKOV J A [SU]) [Y] 1,4,5 * abstract *; | [DY]JPH06327095 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [DY] 1-5 * abstract *; | [A]US5815587 (GOLLER LARS [DK]) [A] 2,3* column 2, line 30 - column 3, line 10; figure 1 *; | [Y]WO0237644 (HARMAN INT IND [US], et al) [Y] 2,3 * page 3, paragraph 14 - page 4, paragraph 16 * * page 7, paragraph 45 - page 8, paragraph 46 *; | [Y]EP1395082 (MINEBEA CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 2,3 * column 2, paragraph 7 - paragraph 12 * * column 3, paragraph 15 - paragraph 17 * * column 5, paragraph 25; figure 2 *; | [Y]EP1418792 (STEP TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]) [Y] 4,5 * column 5, paragraph 28 - paragraph 30; figure 2 * |