EP1801645 - Film transport device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.10.2010 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.10.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 10.11.2010 [2010/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ARNOLD & RICHTER CINE TECHNIK GMBH & CO. BETRIEBS KG Türkenstrasse 89 80799 München / DE | [2007/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Cieslinski, Michael Grünauer Allee 51 82008 Unterhaching / DE | [2007/37] |
Former [2007/26] | 01 /
Cieslinski, Michael Delpstrasse 8 82008 Unterhaching / DE | Representative(s) | Manitz Finsterwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Postfach 31 02 20 80102 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/26] | Manitz, Finsterwald & Partner GbR Postfach 31 02 20 80102 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06026810.9 | 22.12.2006 | [2007/26] | Priority number, date | DE20051061993 | 23.12.2005 Original published format: DE102005061993 | [2007/26] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1801645 | Date: | 27.06.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1801645 | Date: | 02.12.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.02.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G03B1/22, G03B27/53, H04N1/00 | [2007/26] | CPC: |
G03B1/22 (EP,US);
G03B27/32 (EP,US);
G03B27/528 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2008/10] |
Former [2007/26] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Filmtransportvorrichtung | [2007/26] | English: | Film transport device | [2007/26] | French: | Dispositif d'avancement du film | [2007/26] | Examination procedure | 27.12.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.12.2007 | Examination requested [2008/07] | 28.12.2007 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 31.01.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 26.06.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.10.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 14.10.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.09.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB669639 (ANDRE CLEMENT COUTANT, et al) [X] 1,14 * page 2, column LEFT; figure 2 *; | [Y]JPH03129353 (TOYO INK MFG CO) [Y] 9* abstract *; | [Y]EP0576371 (EASTMAN KODAK CO [US]) [Y] 8,12,13,15,16 * columns 8-11; figures 2,3,11-13 *; | [XY]US5529232 (BLANDING DOUGLASS L [US]) [X] 1-7,11,14 * columns 1-5; figures 6-12 * [Y] 8,9,12,13,15,16; | [X]WO9619751 (PRECISION CAMERA INC [CA]) [X] 1,10,14 * pages 3-5; figure 1; claim 1 * | Examination | DE368260 | by applicant | GB669639 | EP0576371 | US5529232 | WO9619751 |