Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2004092905 | Global Dossier | 18.08.2005 | A3 | WO2004092905 | 28.10.2004 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US41061903 | 08.04.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO03105010 | Global Dossier | 18.12.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US38714602 | 06.06.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO0227552 | Global Dossier | 06.11.2003 | A3 | WO0227552 | 04.04.2002 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US23551300 | 26.09.2000 | US70618100 | 03.11.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9444791 | Global Dossier | 13.09.2016 | B2 | US2015334091 | 19.11.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US38714602 | 06.06.2002 | US57265609 | 02.10.2009 | US45635403 | 05.06.2003 | US6079202 | 29.01.2002 | US70618100 | 03.11.2000 | US201514814417 | 30.07.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8738731 | Global Dossier | 27.05.2014 | B2 | US2013117821 | 09.05.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US35009701 | 02.11.2001 | US23551300 | 26.09.2000 | US82192810 | 23.06.2010 | US201213692443 | 03.12.2012 | US6079202 | 29.01.2002 | US70618100 | 03.11.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2011208838 | Global Dossier | 25.08.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US58215109 | 20.10.2009 | US35009701 | 02.11.2001 | US201113098133 | 29.04.2011 | US41061903 | 08.04.2003 | US6079202 | 29.01.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9183188 | Global Dossier | 10.11.2015 | B2 | US2011161799 | 30.06.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US70629600 | 03.11.2000 | US95566510 | 29.11.2010 | US23551300 | 26.09.2000 | US53912406 | 05.10.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2011145893 | Global Dossier | 16.06.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US35009701 | 02.11.2001 | US55548006 | 01.11.2006 | US6052502 | 29.01.2002 | US96673410 | 13.12.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2011131478 | Global Dossier | 02.06.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US70629700 | 03.11.2000 | US23551300 | 26.09.2000 | US95700110 | 30.11.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8326981 | Global Dossier | 04.12.2012 | B2 | US2010263035 | 14.10.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US23551300 | 26.09.2000 | US82192810 | 23.06.2010 | US6079202 | 29.01.2002 | US70618100 | 03.11.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7958245 | Global Dossier | 07.06.2011 | B2 | US2010057845 | 04.03.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US58215109 | 20.10.2009 | US35009701 | 02.11.2001 | US41061903 | 08.04.2003 | US6079202 | 29.01.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9130936 | Global Dossier | 08.09.2015 | B2 | US2010049795 | 25.02.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US38714602 | 06.06.2002 | US57265609 | 02.10.2009 | US45635403 | 05.06.2003 | US6079202 | 29.01.2002 | US70618100 | 03.11.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7865843 | Global Dossier | 04.01.2011 | B2 | US2007073806 | 29.03.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US70629600 | 03.11.2000 | US23551300 | 26.09.2000 | US53912406 | 05.10.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7877440 | Global Dossier | 25.01.2011 | B2 | US2007055864 | 08.03.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US35009701 | 02.11.2001 | US55548006 | 01.11.2006 | US6052502 | 29.01.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7877459 | Global Dossier | 25.01.2011 | B2 | US2006218242 | 28.09.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US42308706 | 08.06.2006 | US23551300 | 26.09.2000 | US70618200 | 03.11.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7631084 | Global Dossier | 08.12.2009 | B2 | US2004039827 | 26.02.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US35009701 | 02.11.2001 | US41061903 | 08.04.2003 | US6079202 | 29.01.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7620719 | Global Dossier | 17.11.2009 | B2 | US2003229718 | 11.12.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US38714602 | 06.06.2002 | US45635403 | 05.06.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4734592B | Global Dossier | 27.07.2011 | B2 | JP2006526843 | 24.11.2006 | A | Priority number | Date | US41061903 | 08.04.2003 | WO2004US11339 | 08.04.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1616263 | Global Dossier | 22.08.2018 | B1 | EP1616263 | 23.11.2011 | A4 | EP1616263 | 18.01.2006 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US41061903 | 08.04.2003 | WO2004US11339 | 08.04.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1532539 | Global Dossier | 09.12.2015 | B1 | EP1532539 | 02.06.2010 | A4 | EP1532539 | 25.05.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US0317934 | 05.06.2003 | US38714602 | 06.06.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1442580 | Global Dossier | 31.05.2017 | B1 | EP1442580 | 04.08.2004 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US35009701 | 02.11.2001 | US6052502 | 29.01.2002 | US6079202 | 29.01.2002 | US0234712 | 29.10.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU9628901 | Global Dossier | 08.04.2002 | A | Priority number | Date | US23551300 | 26.09.2000 | US70618100 | 03.11.2000 | US0129726 | 21.09.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2003274400 | Global Dossier | 22.12.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US0317934 | 05.06.2003 | US38714602 | 06.06.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1777912 | Global Dossier | 15.08.2018 | B1 | EP1777912 | 25.04.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP02782250 | 29.10.2002 | US35009701 | 02.11.2001 | US6052502 | 29.01.2002 | US6079202 | 29.01.2002 | US0234712 | 29.10.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN100437530C | 26.11.2008 | C | CN1781087 | 31.05.2006 | A | Priority number | Date | US41061903 | 08.04.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN1605181B | 07.09.2011 | B | CN1605181 | 06.04.2005 | A | Priority number | Date | US35009701 | 02.11.2001 | US6052502 | 29.01.2002 | US6079202 | 29.01.2002 | US0234712 | 29.10.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | IL161735 | 31.08.2011 | A | Priority number | Date | US35009701 | 02.11.2001 | US6052502 | 29.01.2002 | US6079202 | 29.01.2002 | US0234712 | 29.10.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7146403 | 05.12.2006 | B2 | US2006242241 | 26.10.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US35009701 | 02.11.2001 | US6052502 | 29.01.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7085817 | 01.08.2006 | B1 | Priority number | Date | US23551300 | 26.09.2000 | US70618200 | 03.11.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7136896 | 14.11.2006 | B1 | Priority number | Date | US70629600 | 03.11.2000 | US23551300 | 26.09.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7774455 | 10.08.2010 | B1 | Priority number | Date | US35009701 | 02.11.2001 | US23551300 | 26.09.2000 | US6079202 | 29.01.2002 | US70618100 | 03.11.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7865569 | 04.01.2011 | B1 | Priority number | Date | US70629700 | 03.11.2000 | US23551300 | 26.09.2000 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO03041360 | Global Dossier | 12.09.2003 | A3 | WO03041360 | 15.05.2003 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US35009701 | 02.11.2001 | US6052502 | 29.01.2002 | US6079202 | 29.01.2002 | Type | Earlier application | EP1442580 |