EP1780219 - Protein S polypeptides and uses thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.02.2010 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.02.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.03.2010 [2010/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE SCRIPPS RESEARCH INSTITUTE 10550 North Torrey Pines Road La Jolla, CA 92037 / US | [2007/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Griffin, John H. 13924 Boqulta Drive Del Mar, CA 92014 / US | 02 /
Fernandez, Jose A. 8581-B Villa La Jolla Drive La Jolla, CA 92037 / US | [2007/18] | Representative(s) | Fisher, Adrian John, et al Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2007/18] | Fisher, Adrian John, et al CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43-45 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 06026900.8 | 02.07.1992 | [2007/18] | Priority number, date | US19910724746 | 02.07.1991 Original published format: US 724746 | US19920907190 | 01.07.1992 Original published format: US 907190 | [2007/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1780219 | Date: | 02.05.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/18] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1780219 | Date: | 01.10.2008 | [2008/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.09.2008 | Classification | IPC: | C07K14/745, C07K16/36, A61K38/17, A61K39/395, G01N33/543, G01N33/68, C07K1/14 | [2007/18] | CPC: |
C07K16/36 (EP,US);
C07K14/745 (EP,US);
C07K16/18 (EP,US);
A61K2039/505 (EP,US);
A61K38/00 (EP,US);
C07K2317/34 (EP,US);
Y10S530/83 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2007/18] | Title | German: | Protein-S-Polypeptide und deren Verwendung | [2007/18] | English: | Protein S polypeptides and uses thereof | [2007/18] | French: | Polypeptides du protéine S et leurs utilisation | [2007/18] | Examination procedure | 31.03.2009 | Examination requested [2009/20] | 08.05.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.09.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/10] | 23.10.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/10] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP92915841.8 / EP0592600 | EP99202141.0 / EP0972781 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 27.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 27.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 27.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 27.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 27.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 27.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 16 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 17 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2009 | 18   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0271810 (TEIJIN LTD [JP]) [A] 1,2,5,6,9,10,13,22-28 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0315447 (TEIJIN LTD [JP]) [A] 1,2,5,6,9,10,13,22-28 * the whole document *; | JPH01231893 [ ] (FUJI YAKUHIN KOGYO KK); | [A] - F. WALKER ET AL., "Characterization of a synthetic peptide that inhibits the interaction between protein S and C4-binding protein.", THE JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, Baltimore, MD, USA, (19891025), vol. 264, no. 30, pages 17645 - 17648, XP002123207 [A] 1,2,5,6,9,10,13,22-28 * the whole document * | [A] - R. WEINSTEIN ET AL., "Enhancement of rabbit protein-S anticoagulant cofactor activity in vivo by modulation of the protein-S - C4b-binding protein interaction.", THE JOURNAL OF CLINICAL INVESTIGATION, New York, NY, USA, (199012), vol. 86, no. 6, pages 1928 - 1935, XP002123208 [A] 1,2,5,6,9,10,13,22-28 * the whole document * | [A] - SUZUKI KOJI ET AL, "Monoclonal antibodies to protein S and their uses", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19900423), vol. 112, no. 17, Database accession no. 156574g, page 574, XP002123210 [A] 1,2,5,6,9,10,13,22-28 * column A * | [A] - S. TOMBESI ET AL., "Evaluation of a new method for protein-S detection using monoclonal antibodies.", CURRENT STUDIES IN HEMATOLOGY AND BLOOD TRANSFUSION, Basel, Switzerland, (199004), vol. 58, pages 205 - 210, XP002123209 [A] 1,2,5,6,9,10,13,22-28 * the whole document * | [T] - FERNÁNDEZ J A ET AL, "Identification of residues 413-433 of plasma protein S as essential for binding to C4b-binding protein.", THE JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY 5 AUG 1993, (19930805), vol. 268, no. 22, ISSN 0021-9258, pages 16788 - 16794, XP002476057 [T] 1,2,5,6,9,10,13,22-28 * the whole document * |