EP1777415 - Pump comprising an integrated motor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.02.2010 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.10.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 09.11.2011 [2011/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BSH Bosch und Siemens Hausgeräte GmbH Carl-Wery-Strasse 34 81739 München / DE | [2007/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kalavsky, Michal Zombova 31 04023 Kosice / SK | 02 /
De Filippis, Pietro Via S. Gregorio 6 20124 Milano / IT | [2007/17] | Application number, filing date | 06026953.7 | 07.07.2004 | [2007/17] | Priority number, date | DE2003133308 | 22.07.2003 Original published format: DE 10333308 | DE2003152487 | 07.11.2003 Original published format: DE 10352487 | [2007/17] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1777415 | Date: | 25.04.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1777415 | Date: | 01.04.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.03.2007 | Classification | IPC: | F04D13/06 | [2007/17] | CPC: |
F04D13/064 (EP,US);
F04D13/06 (KR);
F04D13/0633 (EP,US);
F04D29/426 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/17] | Title | German: | Pumpe mit integriertem Motor | [2007/17] | English: | Pump comprising an integrated motor | [2007/17] | French: | Pompe à moteur intégré | [2007/17] | Examination procedure | 25.10.2007 | Examination requested [2007/50] | 23.10.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.02.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 13.02.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP04740758.0 / EP1649169 | Opposition(s) | 05.01.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 01.04.2009 | CZ | 01.04.2009 | DK | 01.04.2009 | EE | 01.04.2009 | FI | 01.04.2009 | IE | 01.04.2009 | NL | 01.04.2009 | PL | 01.04.2009 | RO | 01.04.2009 | SI | 01.04.2009 | BG | 01.07.2009 | SE | 01.07.2009 | GR | 02.07.2009 | AT | 07.07.2009 | GB | 07.07.2009 | LU | 07.07.2009 | BE | 31.07.2009 | CH | 31.07.2009 | FR | 31.07.2009 | LI | 31.07.2009 | MC | 31.07.2009 | PT | 02.09.2009 | HU | 02.10.2009 | [2011/45] |
Former [2011/32] | CZ | 01.04.2009 | |
DK | 01.04.2009 | ||
EE | 01.04.2009 | ||
FI | 01.04.2009 | ||
IE | 01.04.2009 | ||
NL | 01.04.2009 | ||
PL | 01.04.2009 | ||
RO | 01.04.2009 | ||
SI | 01.04.2009 | ||
BG | 01.07.2009 | ||
SE | 01.07.2009 | ||
GR | 02.07.2009 | ||
AT | 07.07.2009 | ||
GB | 07.07.2009 | ||
LU | 07.07.2009 | ||
BE | 31.07.2009 | ||
CH | 31.07.2009 | ||
FR | 31.07.2009 | ||
LI | 31.07.2009 | ||
MC | 31.07.2009 | ||
PT | 02.09.2009 | ||
HU | 02.10.2009 | ||
Former [2011/22] | CZ | 01.04.2009 | |
DK | 01.04.2009 | ||
EE | 01.04.2009 | ||
FI | 01.04.2009 | ||
IE | 01.04.2009 | ||
NL | 01.04.2009 | ||
PL | 01.04.2009 | ||
RO | 01.04.2009 | ||
SI | 01.04.2009 | ||
BG | 01.07.2009 | ||
SE | 01.07.2009 | ||
GR | 02.07.2009 | ||
AT | 07.07.2009 | ||
GB | 07.07.2009 | ||
LU | 07.07.2009 | ||
BE | 31.07.2009 | ||
CH | 31.07.2009 | ||
FR | 31.07.2009 | ||
LI | 31.07.2009 | ||
MC | 31.07.2009 | ||
PT | 02.09.2009 | ||
Former [2011/03] | CZ | 01.04.2009 | |
DK | 01.04.2009 | ||
EE | 01.04.2009 | ||
FI | 01.04.2009 | ||
IE | 01.04.2009 | ||
NL | 01.04.2009 | ||
PL | 01.04.2009 | ||
RO | 01.04.2009 | ||
SI | 01.04.2009 | ||
BG | 01.07.2009 | ||
SE | 01.07.2009 | ||
GR | 02.07.2009 | ||
AT | 07.07.2009 | ||
GB | 07.07.2009 | ||
BE | 31.07.2009 | ||
CH | 31.07.2009 | ||
FR | 31.07.2009 | ||
LI | 31.07.2009 | ||
MC | 31.07.2009 | ||
PT | 02.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/29] | CZ | 01.04.2009 | |
DK | 01.04.2009 | ||
EE | 01.04.2009 | ||
FI | 01.04.2009 | ||
IE | 01.04.2009 | ||
NL | 01.04.2009 | ||
PL | 01.04.2009 | ||
RO | 01.04.2009 | ||
SI | 01.04.2009 | ||
BG | 01.07.2009 | ||
SE | 01.07.2009 | ||
GB | 07.07.2009 | ||
BE | 31.07.2009 | ||
CH | 31.07.2009 | ||
FR | 31.07.2009 | ||
LI | 31.07.2009 | ||
MC | 31.07.2009 | ||
PT | 02.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/25] | CZ | 01.04.2009 | |
DK | 01.04.2009 | ||
EE | 01.04.2009 | ||
FI | 01.04.2009 | ||
IE | 01.04.2009 | ||
NL | 01.04.2009 | ||
PL | 01.04.2009 | ||
RO | 01.04.2009 | ||
SI | 01.04.2009 | ||
BG | 01.07.2009 | ||
SE | 01.07.2009 | ||
GB | 07.07.2009 | ||
CH | 31.07.2009 | ||
FR | 31.07.2009 | ||
LI | 31.07.2009 | ||
MC | 31.07.2009 | ||
PT | 02.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/18] | CZ | 01.04.2009 | |
DK | 01.04.2009 | ||
EE | 01.04.2009 | ||
FI | 01.04.2009 | ||
IE | 01.04.2009 | ||
NL | 01.04.2009 | ||
PL | 01.04.2009 | ||
RO | 01.04.2009 | ||
SI | 01.04.2009 | ||
BG | 01.07.2009 | ||
SE | 01.07.2009 | ||
MC | 31.07.2009 | ||
PT | 02.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/13] | CZ | 01.04.2009 | |
DK | 01.04.2009 | ||
EE | 01.04.2009 | ||
FI | 01.04.2009 | ||
IE | 01.04.2009 | ||
NL | 01.04.2009 | ||
PL | 01.04.2009 | ||
RO | 01.04.2009 | ||
SI | 01.04.2009 | ||
SE | 01.07.2009 | ||
MC | 31.07.2009 | ||
PT | 02.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/07] | EE | 01.04.2009 | |
FI | 01.04.2009 | ||
IE | 01.04.2009 | ||
NL | 01.04.2009 | ||
PL | 01.04.2009 | ||
SI | 01.04.2009 | ||
SE | 01.07.2009 | ||
PT | 02.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/02] | EE | 01.04.2009 | |
FI | 01.04.2009 | ||
NL | 01.04.2009 | ||
PL | 01.04.2009 | ||
SI | 01.04.2009 | ||
SE | 01.07.2009 | ||
PT | 02.09.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2608228 (VALEO [FR]) [A] 1 * page 2, line 20 - page 4, line 6; compound 1 * * page 8, line 1 - page 9, line 21; figure 6 *; | [A]DE3822897 (WEBASTO AG FAHRZEUGTECHNIK [DE]) [A] 1,3,4 * column 1, line 46 - column 2, line 17 * * column 2, line 57 - column 3, line 27; compound 1 *; | [A]EP0711019 (WILO GMBH [DE]) [A] 1,2 * column 4, line 45 - column 5, line 3; figure 1; claims 1-3 *; | [A]WO0138741 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE], et al) [A] 1,2 * page 6, line 27 - page 7, line 22; figure 1 *; | [A]DE10154630 (DIEHL AKO STIFTUNG GMBH & CO [DE]) [A] 1,3,4* paragraph [0014]; figure 1 * |