EP1835622 - Systems and methods for providing power to ultrasonic welding probes [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 05.07.2019 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 17.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.07.2019 | Refusal of application | published on 07.08.2019 [2019/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dukane IAS, LLC 2900 Dukane Drive St. Charles, IL 60174 / US | [2016/20] |
Former [2007/38] | For all designated states DUKANE CORPORATION 2900 Dukane Drive St. Charles, IL 60174 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Johansen, David K. 1112 Patton Avenue Lake in The Hills IL 60156 / US | 02 /
Leonard, Charles L. 1005 Heatherton Drive Naperville IL 60563 / US | 03 /
Klinstein, Leo 4287 Linden Tree Lane Glenview IL 60025 / US | 04 /
Jurkowski, William E. 1550 Hyatt Drive Wheaton IL 60187 / US | 05 /
Re, Joseph 371 Kromray Road Lemont IL 60439 / US | [2007/38] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/38] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06027086.5 | 29.12.2006 | [2007/38] | Priority number, date | US20050754681P | 29.12.2005 Original published format: US 754681 P | [2007/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1835622 | Date: | 19.09.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/38] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1835622 | Date: | 28.10.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.10.2015 | Classification | IPC: | B06B1/02 | [2010/52] | CPC: |
B06B1/0261 (EP,US);
B29C65/08 (EP,US);
B29C66/3022 (EP);
B29C66/8322 (EP);
B29C66/847 (EP);
B29C66/8748 (EP);
B29C66/924 (EP,US);
B29C66/962 (EP,US);
B29C66/949 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2007/38] | H03L5/02 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2016/23] |
Former [2007/38] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Systeme und Verfahren zur Bereitstellung von Energie für eine Ultraschallschweißsonde | [2007/38] | English: | Systems and methods for providing power to ultrasonic welding probes | [2007/38] | French: | Systèmes et procédés d'alimentation de sondes de soudage aux ultrasons | [2007/38] | Examination procedure | 26.04.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.04.2016 | Examination requested [2016/23] | 21.03.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.07.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.10.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.02.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.01.2019 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 28.01.2019 | 28.01.2019 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 14.03.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2019/32] | 24.03.2019 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2019/32] | Divisional application(s) | EP19174217.0 / EP3566783 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 21.03.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 11.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 10.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 13.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 12.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 12.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US4973876 (ROBERTS ALLAN J [US]) [X] 1,2,6 * abstract * * column 1, line 29 - line 46 * * column 4, line 15 - column 5, line 20 * [A] 3-5; | [A]US6827247 (FAN LIMING [SG], et al) [A] 1-6 * abstract ** columns 1, 2 * | Examination | EP0829735 | US2004152982 |