EP1818940 - Hermetically sealed hard disk assembly and method of sealing with soldering material [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.10.2010 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.10.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.11.2010 [2010/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi Global Storage Technologies B. V. Locatellikade 1 1076 AZ Amsterdam / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2007/33] | For all designated states Hitachi Global Storage Technologies B. V. Locatellikade 1 01 AZ Amsterdam / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hatchett, Michael, R. 14974 W Gentle Breeze Way Surprise AZ 85374 / US | 02 /
Price, Kirk 466 Madison Drive San Jose CA 95123 / US | [2007/33] | Representative(s) | Kirschner, Klaus Dieter Puschmann Borchert Bardehle Patentanwälte Partnerschaft Postfach 10 12 31 80086 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/28] | Kirschner, Klaus Dieter Puschmann & Borchert Patentanwälte Bajuwarenring 21 82041 Oberhaching / DE | ||
Former [2007/33] | Kirschner, Klaus Dieter Kirschner Patentanwaltskanzlei Sollner Strasse 38 81479 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06027123.6 | 29.12.2006 | [2007/33] | Priority number, date | US20060351440 | 09.02.2006 Original published format: US 351440 | [2007/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1818940 | Date: | 15.08.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.03.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G11B33/14, G11B25/04 | [2007/33] | CPC: |
G11B25/043 (EP,US);
G11B21/02 (KR);
G11B33/14 (EP,US);
G11B33/1466 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2008/17] |
Former [2007/33] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Hermetisch abgedichtete Festplatteneinheit und Methode zur Abdichtung mit Lot | [2007/33] | English: | Hermetically sealed hard disk assembly and method of sealing with soldering material | [2007/33] | French: | Disque dur fermé hermètiquement et méthode de fermeture par soudure | [2007/33] | Examination procedure | 14.08.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.02.2008 | Examination requested [2008/12] | 19.02.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 27.03.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 21.08.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.11.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.02.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M03) | 29.05.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/47] | 07.07.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XD]US6392838 (HEARN PATRICK [US], et al) [XD] 1-11 * column 5, lines 1-9; figure 10 *; | [AD]US2003179489 (BERNETT FRANK WILLIAM [US], et al) [AD] 1-3,6,11,12* paragraphs [0046] - [0049]; figures 5,9 *; | [XDA]US2004021980 (ALBRECHT THOMAS R [CH], et al) [XD] 1-11 * paragraphs [0020] - [0023]; figure 1a; claims 13,14 * [A] 12; | [A]US2005173870 (GUNDERSON NEAL F [US]) [A] 1-3,6,11,12 * paragraphs [0027] , [0032] , [0036] *; | [A]US2005225893 (NAKAMURA YOSHIHIKO [JP]) [A] 4,8 * abstract * |