EP1806323 - Process and reactor for anaerobic waste water purification [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.06.2008 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.06.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.07.2008 [2008/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BIOTHANE SYSTEMS INTERNATIONAL B.V. Tanthofdreef 21 NL-2623 EW Delft / NL | [2007/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Frankin, Robertus Johannes Jalan Jaruk Purut Buntu, kav. C Cilandak Jakarta / ID | 02 /
Otten, Michael Johannes Jl. Pondok Hijau IV, nr 11 Pondok Indah Jakarta 12310 / ID | [2007/28] | Representative(s) | Winckels, Johannes Hubertus F., et al Vereenigde Johan de Wittlaan 7 2517 JR Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2007/28] | Winckels, Johannes Hubertus F., et al Vereenigde Johan de Wittlaan 7 2517 JR Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 06075014.8 | 05.01.2006 | [2007/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1806323 | Date: | 11.07.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.06.2006 | Classification | IPC: | C02F3/28 | [2007/28] | CPC: |
C02F3/2846 (EP,US);
C02F3/28 (KR);
C12M21/04 (EP,US);
C12M23/36 (EP,US);
C12M27/20 (EP,US);
C12M47/02 (EP,US);
Y02E50/30 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2008/12] |
Former [2007/28] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren und Reaktor zur anaerobische Abwasserreinigung | [2007/28] | English: | Process and reactor for anaerobic waste water purification | [2007/28] | French: | Procédé et Installation pour la purification anaérobie des eaux usées | [2007/28] | Examination procedure | 11.01.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/30] | 27.02.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2008/30] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2008 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE3641260 (STADLBAUER ERNST A [DE], et al) [X] 1-19 * figure 1 *; | [X]EP1588988 (BIOTHANE SYSTEMS INT BV [NL]) [X] 19* abstract * | by applicant | - FRANKIN R.J., "Full scale experiences with anaerobic treatment of industrial wastewater", WAT SCI. TECH., (2001), vol. 44, no. 8, pages 1 - 6 |