EP1696263 - A combined audio-visual system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.01.2012 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.01.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.02.2012 [2012/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Art Cinema B.V. De Dolfijn 20-22 1601 MG Enkhuizen / NL | [2006/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Van Setten, Albertus Johannes Herenkamer 25 1602 KX Enkhuizen / NL | 02 /
Roelandschap, Erwin Patrick Europasingel 96 1693 GV Wervershoof / NL | [2006/35] | Representative(s) | Klavers, Cornelis Octrooibureau Klavers B.V. P.O. Box 1642 1300 BP Almere / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2009/48] | Klavers, Cornelis Octrooibureau Klavers B.V. P.O. Box 1642 1300 BP Almere / NL | ||
Former [2006/41] | Klavers, Cornelis Octrooibureau Klavers B.V. P.O. Box 1642 NL-1300 BP Almere / NL | ||
Former [2006/35] | Klavers, Cornelis Octrooibureau Klavers B.V. P.O. Box 1642 NL-1314 AJ Almere / NL | Application number, filing date | 06075244.1 | 02.02.2006 | [2006/35] | Priority number, date | NL20051028425 | 28.02.2005 Original published format: NL 1028425 | [2006/35] | Filing language | NL | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1696263 | Date: | 30.08.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.07.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G03B21/56 | [2006/35] | CPC: |
G03B21/565 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/35] | Title | German: | Kombiniertes audiovisuelles System | [2006/35] | English: | A combined audio-visual system | [2006/35] | French: | Système audiovisuel combiné | [2006/35] | Examination procedure | 24.11.2006 | Examination requested [2007/02] | 09.01.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.07.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.04.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.08.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.09.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/08] | 10.10.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2012/08] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.01.2007 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2011 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP2000010193 ; | [X]JP2005025046 ; | [X]US2187904 (HURLEY ALBERT B) [X] 1 * column 1, lines 5-8; figures 1-6 *; | [X]US2346257 (OTTO HEHN) [X] 1 * column 1, lines 1-5; figures 1-8 * * column 4, lines 25-40 *; | [Y]GB577684 (CINEMA TELEVISION LTD, et al) [Y] 6,7* page 2, lines 38-41,62-71; figure 5 *; | [XY]US6552847 (CONGARD PATRICE BERNARD FRANCO [FR]) [X] 1-5,8-12 * column 3 - column 7; figures 1-10 * [Y] 6,7 | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20000831), vol. 2000, no. 04, & JP2000010193 A 20000114 (IISTONE:KK) [X] 1,2,4,5 * abstract * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20031205), vol. 2003, no. 12, & JP2005025046 A 20050127 (NIPPON DENSHI KOGAKU KOGYO KK) [X] 1,2,4,9 * abstract * |