EP1764850 - STRUCTURES OF TERMINALS AND COMPONENT-TO-BE LOADED [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 14.06.2013 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2013 | Patent maintained (B2 publication) | published on 17.07.2013 [2013/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Corporation 6-7-35, Kitashinagawa Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141 / JP | [2013/29] |
Former [2008/26] | For all designated states Sony Corporation 6-7-35 Kitashinagawa, Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141 / JP | ||
Former [2007/12] | For all designated states SONY CORPORATION 6-7-35 Kitashinagawa, Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ebine, Nobuhito IP Dept. Sony Corporation 6-7-35 Kitashinagawa Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141 / JP | 02 /
Takeshita, Toshio c/o Sony Corporation IP-Department 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [2013/29] |
Former [2007/27] | 01 /
Ebine, Nobuhito IP Dept. Sony Corporation 6-7-35 Kitashinagawa Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141 / JP | ||
02 /
Takeshita, Toshio c/o Sony Corporation IP-Department 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | |||
Former [2007/12] | 01 /
Ebine, Nobuhito IP Dept. Sony Corporation 6-7-35 Kitashinagawa Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141 / JP | Representative(s) | Körber, Martin Hans Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Sonnenstrasse 33 80331 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/29] | Körber, Martin Hans Mitscherlich & Partner Sonnenstraße 33 80331 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/30] | Körber, Martin Hans Mitscherlich & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Sonnenstraße 33 80331 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/26] | Körber, Martin Hans Mitscherlich & Partner Sonnenstrasse 33 80331 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/42] | Robinson, Nigel Alexander Julian, et al D Young & Co 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | ||
Former [2007/12] | Pilch, Adam John Michael D Young & Co 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | Application number, filing date | 06075969.3 | 24.07.2002 | [2007/12] | Priority number, date | JP20010224013 | 25.07.2001 Original published format: JP 2001224013 | JP20010224014 | 25.07.2001 Original published format: JP 2001224014 | [2007/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1764850 | Date: | 21.03.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/12] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1764850 | Date: | 18.04.2007 | [2007/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1764850 | Date: | 25.06.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/26] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP1764850 | Date: | 17.07.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.03.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H01M2/10, H01R13/631, H01R13/64, G06F1/26 | [2007/12] | CPC: |
H01R13/629 (EP,KR,US);
H01M50/20 (KR);
H01M50/103 (EP,KR,US);
H01M50/209 (EP,KR,US);
H01M50/296 (EP,KR,US);
H01R13/03 (EP,KR,US);
H01R13/112 (EP,KR,US);
H01R13/113 (EP,KR,US);
H01R13/405 (EP,KR,US);
H01R13/62933 (EP,KR,US);
H01R13/631 (EP,KR,US);
H01R13/64 (EP,KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2007/12] | Title | German: | STRUKTUREN VON ANSCHLUSSELEMENTEN UND ANZUSCHLIESSENDE KOMPONENTE | [2007/12] | English: | STRUCTURES OF TERMINALS AND COMPONENT-TO-BE LOADED | [2007/12] | French: | STRUCTURES DE TERMINAUX ET COMPOSANTE A CONNECTER | [2007/12] | Examination procedure | 17.07.2006 | Examination requested [2007/12] | 25.06.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.09.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.01.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.05.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 06.05.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP02749360.0 / EP1411565 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
25.03.2009
03.04.2009
ADMISSIBLE HAMA GmbH & Co KG Dresdner Strasse 9 86653 Monheim / DE Opponent's representative Eisenführ Speiser, et al, et al Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Postfach 10 60 78 28060 Bremen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/34] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
25.03.2009
03.04.2009
ADMISSIBLE HAMA GmbH & Co KG Dresdner Strasse 9 86653 Monheim / DE Opponent's representative Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner, et al, et al Postfach 10 60 78 28060 Bremen / DE | ||
Former [2009/18] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
25.03.2009
HAMA GmbH & Co KG Dresdner Strasse 9 86653 Monheim / DE Opponent's representative Eisenführ, Günther, et al, et al Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner Martinistrasse 24 D-28195 Bremen / DE | 29.04.2009 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 19.10.2009 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 24.03.2011 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 24.03.2011 | Date of oral proceedings | 24.05.2011 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 24.05.2011 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 13.03.2013 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 04.06.2013 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Appeal following opposition | 03.08.2011 | Appeal received No. T1785/11 | 04.10.2011 | Statement of grounds filed | 06.02.2013 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the opponent withdrawn | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.04.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.04.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.04.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]EP0653817 (WHITAKER CORP [US]) [X] 1-4,7,8 * column 1, lines 5-12; figure 1 * * column 2, lines 32-48 * * column 5, lines 40-57 * * figures 6,11 * [Y] 10-13; | [X]US5518424 (DOUTY GEORGE H [US], et al) [X] 1-13 * column 3, lines 13-23; figures 1,12,16 * * column 5, line 22 - column 6, line 22 *; | [A]US5951331 (LI-MING PAI [TW], et al) [A] 1-13* figures 1,6 *; | [A]US6050858 (LIU JIA-HUNG [TW], et al) [A] 1-8 * the whole document *; | [XY]US6086403 (PO LI-MING [TW], et al) [X] 1-4,7,8 * column 1, lines 10-12,35-38; figure 3 * * column 3, line 8 - column 4, line 6 * [Y] 10-13; | [X]US6095839 (KLINE RICHARD SCOTT [US]) [X] 1-4,7,8 * column 1, lines 14,15; figures 2,4,9 * * column 2, line 14 - column 3, line 42 *; | [Y]US6171126 (WU JERRY [TW], et al) [Y] 10-13 * column 1, lines 4-17; figures 1,2 * * column 2, line 47 - column 3, line 63 * |