EP1747921 - Cabin air filter [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.12.2009 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.10.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 09.11.2011 [2011/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Delphi Technologies, Inc. P.O. Box 5052 Troy, MI 48007 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2007/05] | For all designated states Delphi Technologies, Inc. P.O. Box 5052 Troy, Michigan 48007 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Goupil, Gerald M., Jr. 7306 Balla Dr Tonawanda, NY 14120 / US | [2007/05] | Representative(s) | Denton, Michael John, et al Delphi France SAS Bât. le Raspail - ZAC Paris Nord 2 22, avenue des Nations CS 65059 Villepinte 95972 Roissy CDG Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2008/34] | Denton, Michael John, et al Delphi European Headquarters 64 avenue de la Pleine de France Paris Nord II B.P. 65059, Tremblay en France 95972 Roissy Charles de Gaulle Cedex / FR | ||
Former [2007/05] | Denton, Michael John, et al Delphi European Headquarters, 64 avenue de la Plaine de France, Paris Nord II, B.P. 65059, Tremblay en France 95972 Roissy Charles de Gaulle Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 06076239.0 | 15.06.2006 | [2007/05] | Priority number, date | US20050190469 | 27.07.2005 Original published format: US 190469 | [2007/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1747921 | Date: | 31.01.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1747921 | Date: | 11.02.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.11.2006 | Classification | IPC: | B60H3/00 | [2007/05] | CPC: |
B60H3/0658 (EP,US);
B60H1/00685 (EP,US);
F04D29/705 (EP,US);
B60H2003/0666 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/05] | Title | German: | Innenraum-Luftfilter | [2007/05] | English: | Cabin air filter | [2007/05] | French: | Filtre à air pour cabine | [2007/05] | Examination procedure | 31.07.2007 | Examination requested [2007/37] | 30.08.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.01.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.09.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.12.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 11.12.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.11.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 11.02.2009 | BE | 11.02.2009 | CY | 11.02.2009 | CZ | 11.02.2009 | DK | 11.02.2009 | EE | 11.02.2009 | FI | 11.02.2009 | IT | 11.02.2009 | LT | 11.02.2009 | LV | 11.02.2009 | NL | 11.02.2009 | PL | 11.02.2009 | RO | 11.02.2009 | SI | 11.02.2009 | SK | 11.02.2009 | TR | 11.02.2009 | BG | 11.05.2009 | SE | 11.05.2009 | GR | 12.05.2009 | ES | 22.05.2009 | IS | 11.06.2009 | IE | 15.06.2009 | LU | 15.06.2009 | MC | 30.06.2009 | PT | 13.07.2009 | HU | 12.08.2009 | [2011/44] |
Former [2011/32] | AT | 11.02.2009 | |
BE | 11.02.2009 | ||
CZ | 11.02.2009 | ||
DK | 11.02.2009 | ||
EE | 11.02.2009 | ||
FI | 11.02.2009 | ||
IT | 11.02.2009 | ||
LT | 11.02.2009 | ||
LV | 11.02.2009 | ||
NL | 11.02.2009 | ||
PL | 11.02.2009 | ||
RO | 11.02.2009 | ||
SI | 11.02.2009 | ||
SK | 11.02.2009 | ||
BG | 11.05.2009 | ||
SE | 11.05.2009 | ||
GR | 12.05.2009 | ||
ES | 22.05.2009 | ||
IS | 11.06.2009 | ||
IE | 15.06.2009 | ||
LU | 15.06.2009 | ||
MC | 30.06.2009 | ||
PT | 13.07.2009 | ||
HU | 12.08.2009 | ||
Former [2011/22] | AT | 11.02.2009 | |
BE | 11.02.2009 | ||
CZ | 11.02.2009 | ||
DK | 11.02.2009 | ||
EE | 11.02.2009 | ||
FI | 11.02.2009 | ||
IT | 11.02.2009 | ||
LT | 11.02.2009 | ||
LV | 11.02.2009 | ||
NL | 11.02.2009 | ||
PL | 11.02.2009 | ||
RO | 11.02.2009 | ||
SI | 11.02.2009 | ||
SK | 11.02.2009 | ||
BG | 11.05.2009 | ||
SE | 11.05.2009 | ||
GR | 12.05.2009 | ||
ES | 22.05.2009 | ||
IS | 11.06.2009 | ||
IE | 15.06.2009 | ||
LU | 15.06.2009 | ||
MC | 30.06.2009 | ||
PT | 13.07.2009 | ||
Former [2011/16] | AT | 11.02.2009 | |
BE | 11.02.2009 | ||
CZ | 11.02.2009 | ||
DK | 11.02.2009 | ||
EE | 11.02.2009 | ||
FI | 11.02.2009 | ||
IT | 11.02.2009 | ||
LT | 11.02.2009 | ||
LV | 11.02.2009 | ||
NL | 11.02.2009 | ||
PL | 11.02.2009 | ||
RO | 11.02.2009 | ||
SI | 11.02.2009 | ||
SK | 11.02.2009 | ||
BG | 11.05.2009 | ||
SE | 11.05.2009 | ||
GR | 12.05.2009 | ||
ES | 22.05.2009 | ||
IS | 11.06.2009 | ||
IE | 15.06.2009 | ||
CH | 30.06.2009 | ||
LI | 30.06.2009 | ||
MC | 30.06.2009 | ||
PT | 13.07.2009 | ||
Former [2011/03] | AT | 11.02.2009 | |
BE | 11.02.2009 | ||
CZ | 11.02.2009 | ||
DK | 11.02.2009 | ||
EE | 11.02.2009 | ||
FI | 11.02.2009 | ||
LT | 11.02.2009 | ||
LV | 11.02.2009 | ||
NL | 11.02.2009 | ||
PL | 11.02.2009 | ||
RO | 11.02.2009 | ||
SI | 11.02.2009 | ||
SK | 11.02.2009 | ||
BG | 11.05.2009 | ||
SE | 11.05.2009 | ||
GR | 12.05.2009 | ||
ES | 22.05.2009 | ||
IS | 11.06.2009 | ||
IE | 15.06.2009 | ||
MC | 30.06.2009 | ||
PT | 13.07.2009 | ||
Former [2010/25] | AT | 11.02.2009 | |
BE | 11.02.2009 | ||
CZ | 11.02.2009 | ||
DK | 11.02.2009 | ||
EE | 11.02.2009 | ||
FI | 11.02.2009 | ||
LT | 11.02.2009 | ||
LV | 11.02.2009 | ||
NL | 11.02.2009 | ||
PL | 11.02.2009 | ||
RO | 11.02.2009 | ||
SI | 11.02.2009 | ||
SK | 11.02.2009 | ||
BG | 11.05.2009 | ||
SE | 11.05.2009 | ||
ES | 22.05.2009 | ||
IS | 11.06.2009 | ||
IE | 15.06.2009 | ||
MC | 30.06.2009 | ||
PT | 13.07.2009 | ||
Former [2010/13] | AT | 11.02.2009 | |
BE | 11.02.2009 | ||
CZ | 11.02.2009 | ||
DK | 11.02.2009 | ||
EE | 11.02.2009 | ||
FI | 11.02.2009 | ||
LT | 11.02.2009 | ||
LV | 11.02.2009 | ||
NL | 11.02.2009 | ||
PL | 11.02.2009 | ||
RO | 11.02.2009 | ||
SI | 11.02.2009 | ||
SK | 11.02.2009 | ||
BG | 11.05.2009 | ||
SE | 11.05.2009 | ||
ES | 22.05.2009 | ||
IS | 11.06.2009 | ||
MC | 30.06.2009 | ||
PT | 13.07.2009 | ||
Former [2010/07] | AT | 11.02.2009 | |
BE | 11.02.2009 | ||
CZ | 11.02.2009 | ||
DK | 11.02.2009 | ||
EE | 11.02.2009 | ||
FI | 11.02.2009 | ||
LT | 11.02.2009 | ||
LV | 11.02.2009 | ||
NL | 11.02.2009 | ||
PL | 11.02.2009 | ||
RO | 11.02.2009 | ||
SI | 11.02.2009 | ||
SK | 11.02.2009 | ||
SE | 11.05.2009 | ||
ES | 22.05.2009 | ||
IS | 11.06.2009 | ||
MC | 30.06.2009 | ||
PT | 13.07.2009 | ||
Former [2010/02] | AT | 11.02.2009 | |
BE | 11.02.2009 | ||
CZ | 11.02.2009 | ||
DK | 11.02.2009 | ||
EE | 11.02.2009 | ||
FI | 11.02.2009 | ||
LT | 11.02.2009 | ||
LV | 11.02.2009 | ||
NL | 11.02.2009 | ||
PL | 11.02.2009 | ||
RO | 11.02.2009 | ||
SI | 11.02.2009 | ||
SK | 11.02.2009 | ||
SE | 11.05.2009 | ||
ES | 22.05.2009 | ||
IS | 11.06.2009 | ||
PT | 13.07.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2063764 (NIX, HANS) [A] 5 * figures 2,3; claim 5 *; | [A]US3870495 (DIXSON BRUCE E, et al) [A] 5 * column 10, line 57 - line 62; figure 5 ** column 11, line 26 - line 28; figure 11 *; | [X]DE19603456 (NIPPON DENSO CO [JP]) [X] 1-4,6,7 * column 3, line 34 - column 4, line 57; figures 1-5 * * column 9, line 1 - line 6; figure 6 *; | [X]US2002013128 (MARUYAMA MIYUKI [JP], et al) [X] 1-4,6,7 * paragraph [0026] - paragraph [0028]; figures 2-6A * |