EP1726574 - Radiation-curable optical glass fiber coating compositions,coated optical glass fibers, and optical glass fiber assemblies [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.07.2010 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.07.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.09.2010 [2010/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DSM IP Assets B.V. Het Overloon 1 6411 TE Heerlen / NL | [2009/38] |
Former [2006/48] | For all designated states DSM IP Assets B.V. Het Overloon 1 6411 TE Heerlen / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Szum, David, M. DSM Desotech Inc. 1122 St. Charles Street Elgin, Illinois 60120 / US | 02 /
Bishop, Timothy, Edward 1720 Riverwood Drive Algonquin, Illinois 60102 / US | 03 /
Zahora, Edward, Paul 11S 601 Walter Lane Naperville, Illinois 60564 / US | 04 /
Pasternack, George DSM Desotech Inc. 1122 St Charles Street Elgin, Illinois 60120 / US | 05 /
Vandeberg, John, Thomas 415 West Oakwood Drive Barrington, Illinois 60010 / US | 06 /
Petisce, James, Raymond 2175 Hamilton Drive West Dundee, Illinois 60118 / US | 07 /
Chawla, Chander, Prakash 1300 North Avenue Batavia, Illinois 60510 / US | 08 /
Lapin, Stephen 7126 Joy Marie Lane Waterford, Wisconsin 53185 / US | 09 /
Snowhite, Paul DSM Desotech Inc. 1122 St Charles Street Elgin, Illinois 60120 / US | [2007/03] |
Former [2006/48] | 01 /
Szum, David, M. 646 N. Oaklawn Avenue Elmhurst, Illinois 60126 / US | ||
02 /
Bishop, Timothy, Edward 1720 Riverwood Drive Algonquin, Illinois 60102 / US | |||
03 /
Zahora, Edward, Paul 11S 601 Walter Lane Naperville, Illinois 60564 / US | |||
04 /
Pasternack, George 656 Masters Lane Riverwoods, Illinois 60015 / US | |||
05 /
Vandeberg, John, Thomas 415 West Oakwood Drive Barrington, Illinois 60010 / US | |||
06 /
Petisce, James, Raymond 2175 Hamilton Drive West Dundee, Illinois 60118 / US | |||
07 /
Chawla, Chander, Prakash 1300 North Avenue Batavia, Illinois 60510 / US | |||
08 /
Lapin, Stephen 7126 Joy Marie Lane Waterford, Wisconsin 53185 / US | |||
09 /
Snowhite, Paul 1 Cobbercourt South Elgin, Illinois 60177 / US | Representative(s) | van Loon, C.J.J. Vereenigde Johan de Wittlaan 7 2517 JR Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2008/34] | van Loon, C.J.J. Vereenigde Johan de Wittlaan 7 2517 JR Den Haag / NL | ||
Former [2007/22] | van Loon, C.J.J. c/o VEREENIGDE Johan de Wittlaan 7 2517 JR Den Haag / NL | ||
Former [2006/48] | Scheltus, Irma DSM Intellectual Property Office Geleen P.O. Box 9 6160 MA Geleen / NL | Application number, filing date | 06076353.9 | 07.11.1997 | [2006/48] | Priority number, date | US19960745790 | 08.11.1996 Original published format: US 745790 | US19970840893 | 17.04.1997 Original published format: US 840893 | US19970877585 | 17.06.1997 Original published format: US 877585 | [2006/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1726574 | Date: | 29.11.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.10.2006 | Classification | IPC: | C03C25/24 | [2006/48] | CPC: |
C03C25/1065 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, DK, FI, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [2006/48] | Title | German: | Strahlungshärtbare Beschichtungszusammensetzungen für optische Glasfasern, beschichtete optische Glasfasern, und optische Glasfaservorrichtungen | [2006/48] | English: | Radiation-curable optical glass fiber coating compositions,coated optical glass fibers, and optical glass fiber assemblies | [2006/48] | French: | Composition durcissable par rayonnement pour fibre optique de verre, fibres optiques de verre et dispositifs pour fibres optiques | [2006/48] | Examination procedure | 04.07.2006 | Examination requested [2006/48] | 26.02.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 26.10.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.10.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.03.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/35] | 15.04.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/35] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP97912565.5 / EP0951458 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 04.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 04.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 04.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 04.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 27.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 25.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2009 | 13   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPS5974506 ; | [X]JPS58115402 ; | [A]EP0116140 (DESOTO INC [US]) [A] 1-27 * page 1, line 4 - page 2, line 24 * * page 4, line 20 - page 5, line 7 * * page 8, line 1 - line 12 ** page 10, line 32 - line 33 *; | [X]EP0260842 (ICI PLC [GB]) [X] 1-16,21,22 * page 2, line 15 - line 51 *; | [A]EP0307218 (RAYCHEM CORP [US]) [A] 1-27 * page 2, line 3 - page 3, line 11 * * page 4, line 52 - page 5, line 35 *; | [X]US5146531 (SHUSTACK PAUL J [US]) [X] 1-16,27 * column 1, line 10 - column 5, line 68 *; | [X]EP0565798 (BORDEN INC [US]) [X] 1-16,24,25,27 * page 2, line 8 - page 3, line 26 * * page 4, line 35 - page 5, line 43 * * page 11, line 55 - page 12, line 33 * * page 25, line 30 - page 26, line 38 *; | [X]DE4302327 (BASF LACKE & FARBEN [DE]) [X] 1-16,26 * page 2, line 56 - page 3, line 60 *; | [DA]US5373578 (PARKER THEODORE L [US], et al) [DA] 1-27 * column 1, line 10 - column 2, line 27 * * column 5, line 3 - line 45 *; | [X]WO9523772 (DSM NV [NL]) [X] 1-16,19,20 * page 1, line 9 - page 3, line 36 * * page 14, line 17 - page 16, line 5 *; | [X]WO9611965 (DSM NV [NL], et al) [X] 1-16,25,26 * page 1, line 9 - page 4, line 8 * * page 11, line 26 - page 14, line 2 *; | [X]WO9612749 (DSM NV [NL]) [X] 1-17 * page 1, line 19 - page 4, line 18 * * page 19, line 22 - page 20, line 1 *; | [X]WO9623828 (DSM NV [NL]) [X] 1-16,21,22 * page 1, line 13 - page 2, line 19 * * page 14 - page 18 *; | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 84, no. 23, Database accession no. 84-143026, XP002053608 & JPS5974506 A 19840427 (NIPPON TELEG AND TELEPH) [X] 1-16,19,20 * abstract * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19831005), vol. 007, no. 224, Database accession no. (P - 227), & JP58115402 A 19830709 (NIPPON DENSHIN DENWA KOSHA;OTHERS: 01) [X] 1-16,23 * abstract * |