EP1752876 - Test system for a user terminal device and test automation method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 24.09.2010 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.09.2010 | Refusal of application | published on 27.10.2010 [2010/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Francotyp-Postalia GmbH Triftweg 21-26 16547 Birkenwerder / DE | [2007/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bleumer, Gerrit, Dr. Mozartstr. 1 16552 Schildow / DE | 02 /
Schwarz, Stefan Stromstr. 23 10551 Berlin / DE | [2007/07] | Application number, filing date | 06076467.7 | 21.07.2006 | [2007/07] | Priority number, date | DE20051038151 | 12.08.2005 Original published format: DE102005038151 | [2007/07] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1752876 | Date: | 14.02.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/07] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1752876 | Date: | 16.07.2008 | [2008/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.06.2008 | Classification | IPC: | G06F11/263 | [2007/07] | CPC: |
G06F11/263 (EP,US);
G06F11/261 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/07] | Title | German: | Testsystem für ein Benutzerendgerät und Testautomatisierungsverfahren | [2007/07] | English: | Test system for a user terminal device and test automation method | [2007/07] | French: | Système de test pour un terminal utilisateur et procédé d'automatisation de test | [2007/07] | Examination procedure | 02.12.2008 | Examination requested [2009/03] | 07.01.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.03.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.05.2010 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2010/43] | 20.05.2010 | Date of oral proceedings | 11.06.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2010/43] | 11.06.2010 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2010 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]EP0284111 (PHILIPS NV [NL]) [X] 1-4,10,12-17,23 * column 3, line 43 - column 4, line 41 * * column 5, line 51 - line 58 * * column 6, line 5 - line 58 * * column 7, line 28 - line 35; figure 1 * [Y] 19-21; | [X]US5157782 (TUTTLE MYRON R [US], et al) [X] 1-4,10,12-17,23 * column 5, line 56 - column 6, line 10 * * column 6, line 31 - line 48 * * column 7, line 48 - column 8, line 61 * * column 13, line 14 - column 14, line 8 * * column 25, line 9 - line 24 * * column 27, line 50 - column 28, line 17 * * column 28, line 53 - column 29, line 2; figures 1,2,5,6,18 *; | [DY]DE10036623 (FRANCOTYP POSTALIA GMBH [DE]) [DY] 19-21 * paragraph [0004] - paragraph [0005] * * paragraph [0022] - paragraph [0024] * * paragraph [0036] * * paragraph [0039] ** paragraph [0043]; figures 3,4 *; | [X]US6522936 (HYODO TATSUYA [JP], et al) [X] 1-4,10,12-17,23 * column 4, line 3 - line 48 * * column 5, line 5 - line 17 * * column 5, line 54 - column 6, line 2 * * column 6, line 22 - line 33 * * column 6, line 56 - column 7, line 8 * * column 7, line 50 - column 8, line 54; figures 1,3,4 * |