EP1834671 - A method for generation of antibodies to cell surface molecules [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.04.2014 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.04.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.05.2014 [2014/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Novartis Vaccines and Diagnostics, Inc. 4560 Horton Street Emeryville, CA 94608 / US | [2007/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
De Boer, Mark Naarderweg 20 1261 BT Blaricum / NL | 02 /
Conroy, Leah B. 515 Beaumont Boulevard Pacifica, CA 94044 / US | [2007/38] | Representative(s) | Marshall, Cameron John, et al Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2007/38] | Marshall, Cameron John, et al Carpmaels & Ransford 43-45 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 06076491.7 | 08.07.1993 | [2007/38] | Priority number, date | US19920910222 | 09.07.1992 Original published format: US 910222 | US19930015147 | 09.02.1993 Original published format: US 15147 | US19930070158 | 28.05.1993 Original published format: US 70158 | [2007/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1834671 | Date: | 19.09.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/38] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1834671 | Date: | 22.05.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.04.2013 | Classification | IPC: | A61P37/00, A61K39/395, C07K16/28, C12N5/12 | [2007/38] | CPC: |
C07K16/2827 (EP);
A61P37/00 (EP);
C07K16/2878 (EP);
A61K2039/505 (EP);
C07K2317/24 (EP);
C07K2317/73 (EP);
C07K2319/30 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | [2014/05] |
Former [2007/38] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Ein Verfahren zur Erregung von Antikörpern gegen Zelloberflächemoleküle | [2007/38] | English: | A method for generation of antibodies to cell surface molecules | [2007/38] | French: | Procédé pour l'induction des anticorps contre des molecules exprimées sur la surface des cellules | [2007/38] | Examination procedure | 23.11.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/22] | 14.01.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2014/22] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP93917032.0 / EP0651797 | EP99104709.3 / EP0945465 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP19930917032) is 13.07.1998 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 31.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 31.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 31.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 31.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 31.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 04.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 16 | 10.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 17 | 14.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 18 | 12.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 19 | 13.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 20 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9200092 (BRISTOL MYERS SQUIBB CO [US]) [A] 1-4,6,7 * page 30, line 16 * * example - ** claim - *; | [XYI] - S. LEDERMAN ET AL., "Anti-CD40 monoclonal antibody vblocks the contact dependent T helper signal mediated by 5C8 Ag.", CLINICAL RESEARCH, Thorofare, NJ, USA, (19920101), vol. 40, no. 2, page 154A, XP002176377 [X] 4,6 * abstract * [Y] 1-3 [I] 7 | [Y] - T. CHANG ET AL., "Monoclonal antibodies specific for human IgE-producing B cells: A potential therapeutic for IgE-mediated allergic diseases.", BIO/TECHNOLOGY, (199002), vol. 8, pages 122 - 126, XP009084134 [Y] 1-3 * abstract * * figure 5 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nbt0290-122 | [IA] - E. CLARK ET AL., "Association between IL-6 and CD40 signaling. IL-6 induces phosphorylation of CD40 receptors.", THE JOURNAL OF IMMUNOLOGY, Baltimore, MD, USA, (19900901), vol. 145, no. 5, pages 1400 - 1406, XP002689362 [I] 6 * page 1401, column r, paragraph 2 * * figure 2 * [A] 1-4,7 |