EP1887017 - Prebiotic carbohydrate [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 27.11.2017 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 15.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.03.2018 | Refusal of application | published on 25.04.2018 [2018/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FrieslandCampina Nederland B.V. Stationsplein 4 3818 LE Amersfoort / NL | [2016/09] |
Former [2010/49] | For all designated states Friesland Brands B.V. Stationsplein 4 3818 LE Amersfoort / NL | ||
Former [2008/07] | For all designated states Friesland Brands B.V. Blankenstein 142 7943 PE Meppel / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
de Slegte, Jaap Ploegdreef 45 7006 KK Doetinchem / NL | 02 /
Sinclair, Haydn Robert 1 Cam Brook Close Camerton, BA2 0PP Bath / GB | 03 /
van den Heuvel, Elisabeth G. H. M. Griftstraat 97 3572 GS Utrecht / NL | [2008/07] | Representative(s) | V.O. P.O. Box 87930 2508 DH Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2012/17] | Jansen, Cornelis Marinus, et al Vereenigde Johan de Wittlaan 7 2517 JR Den Haag / NL | ||
Former [2008/34] | van Loon, C.J.J., et al Vereenigde Johan de Wittlaan 7 2517 JR Den Haag / NL | ||
Former [2008/07] | van Loon, C.J.J., et al c/o VEREENIGDE Johan de Wittlaan 7 2517 JR Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 06076550.0 | 09.08.2006 | [2008/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1887017 | Date: | 13.02.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.04.2007 | Classification | IPC: | C08B37/00, C07H3/04, C07H3/06, A61K31/7016, A61K31/702, A23L1/30, A23L1/09, A61P1/12, A61P1/04 | [2008/07] | CPC: |
C12P19/12 (EP);
A23L7/00 (EP,US);
A23L29/30 (EP);
A23L33/10 (EP);
A23L33/25 (EP);
A23L5/00 (EP,US);
A61K31/7016 (EP);
A61K31/702 (EP);
A61P1/04 (EP);
A61P1/12 (EP);
C07H3/04 (EP);
C07H3/06 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/07] | Title | German: | Praebiotische Kohenlhydraten | [2008/07] | English: | Prebiotic carbohydrate | [2008/07] | French: | Carbohydrates prébiotiques | [2008/07] | Examination procedure | 08.08.2008 | Examination requested [2008/39] | 06.11.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.05.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.07.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.10.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.06.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.12.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.04.2016 | Observations by third parties | 31.05.2016 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 24.10.2016 | 12.07.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.10.2016 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 12.01.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.02.2017 | Observations by third parties | 13.11.2017 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 27.11.2017 | 27.11.2017 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 28.11.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2018/17] | 08.12.2017 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2018/17] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.11.2008 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 15.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 15.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 31.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 28.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 28.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO03104473 (SUEDZUCKER AG [DE], et al) [A] * page 73; examples 7,8 * * claims 52-59 * * claims 20-28 * * claims 31,32 *; | [A]WO2004017979 (FINZELBERG GMBH & CO KG [DE], et al) [A] 1,2,7,8 * claims 1,4,13 *; | [A]EP1408118 (CONSEJO SUPERIOR INVESTIGACION [ES], et al) [A] * paragraphs [0005] , [0006] * * paragraph [0015] *; | [X]WO2005037293 (UNIV MONASH [AU], et al) [X] 1,5-8 * paragraph [0013] * * paragraph [0080] * * paragraph [0151] * * claims 1,8,9 *; | [A] - RIVERA-SAGREDO A ET AL, "4-O-BETA-D-GALACTOPYRANOSYL-D-XYLOSE: A NEW SYNTHESIS AND APPLICATION TO THE EVALUATION OF INTESTINAL LACTASE", CARBOHYDRATE RESEARCH, ELSEVIER SCIENTIFIC PUBLISHING COMPANY. AMSTERDAM, NL, (19920410), vol. 228, no. 1, ISSN 0008-6215, pages 129 - 135, XP000644500 [A] * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0008-6215(00)90554-8 | [X] - LEMIEUX R U ET AL, "The combining site of anti-I Ma (group 1).", MOLECULAR IMMUNOLOGY SEP 1984, (198409), vol. 21, no. 9, ISSN 0161-5890, pages 751 - 759, XP008077072 [X] 12-15 * figure 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0161-5890(84)90161-5 | [X] - TAGUCHI I ET AL, "Structure of oligosaccharide side chains of an intestinal immune system modulating arabinogalactan isolated from rhizomes of Atractylodes lancea DC", CARBOHYDRATE RESEARCH, ELSEVIER SCIENTIFIC PUBLISHING COMPANY. AMSTERDAM, NL, (20040315), vol. 339, no. 4, ISSN 0008-6215, pages 763 - 770, XP004491928 [X] 12-14 * table 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.carres.2004.01.003 | [X] - FAN ET AL, "Structural elucidation of a neutral fucogalactan from the mycelium of Coprinus comatus", CARBOHYDRATE RESEARCH, ELSEVIER SCIENTIFIC PUBLISHING COMPANY. AMSTERDAM, NL, (20060703), vol. 341, no. 9, ISSN 0008-6215, pages 1130 - 1134, XP005434178 [X] 12,13,15,16 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.carres.2006.03.039 | [X] - PREVIATO, JONES, "O-glycosidically linked N acetylglucosamine...", BIOCHEM. J., (1994), vol. 301, pages 151 - 159, XP008077126 [X] 9,12-14,18,20 * table 4 * | [X] - GERWIG, GERRIT J. ET AL, "The nature of the carbohydrate-peptide linkage region in glycoproteins from the cellulosomes of Clostridium thermocellum and Bacteroides cellulosolvens", JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY , 268(36), 26956-60 CODEN: JBCHA3; ISSN: 0021-9258, (1993), XP008077088 [X] 12-14 * table 1 * | [X] - TAKADA, KATSUTOSHI ET AL, "Core structure of glycyrrhizan GA, the main polysaccharide from the stolon of Glycyrrhiza glabra var. glandulifera; anti-complementary and alkaline phosphatase-inducing activities of the polysaccharide and its degradation products", CHEMICAL & PHARMACEUTICAL BULLETIN , 40(9), 2487-90 CODEN: CPBTAL; ISSN: 0009-2363, (1992), XP008077094 [X] 12,13,15,16 * table 1 * | [X] - NEPOGOD'EV, S. A. ET AL, "Synthesis of a bacterial galactofuranan, the component of T1 lipopolysaccharide", BIOORGANICHESKAYA KHIMIYA , 15(11), 1555-60 CODEN: BIKHD7; ISSN: 0132-3423, (1989), XP008077083 [X] 12-14 * page 858, paragraph 3 * | Examination | WO2005003329 | - BEYNEN A C, "INCREASED CONCENTRATIONS OF LIVER CHOLESTEROL IN RATS FED LACTULOSE", NAHRUNG - FOOD, VCH VERLAGSGESELLSCHAFT, WEINHEIM, XX, (19890101), vol. 33, no. 1, doi:10.1002/FOOD.19890330130, ISSN 0027-769X, pages 89 - 90, XP008072533 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/food.19890330130 | - KIMURA M ET AL, "EFFECT OF PURE LACTULOSE (PIARLE(R) DRY SYRUP) ON GROWTH OF INTESTINAL BIFIDOBACTERIUM IN RATS", YAKURI TO CHIRYO - JAPANESE PHARMACOLOGY AND THERAPEUTICS, RAIFU SAIENSU SHUPPAN, TOKYO, JP, (19990101), vol. 27, no. 2, ISSN 0386-3603, pages 73 - 78, XP008072532 | - BIRD S P ET AL, "EFFECTS OF LACTULOSE AND LACTITOL ON PROTEIN DIGESTION AND METABOLISM IN CONVENTIONAL AND GERM FREE ANIMAL MODELS RELEVANCE OF THE RESULTS TO THEIR USE IN THE TREATMENT OF PORTOSYSTEMIC ENCEPHALOPATHY", GUT, BRITISH MEDICAL ASSOCIATION, LONDON, UK, (19900101), vol. 31, no. 12, doi:10.1136/GUT.31.12.1403, ISSN 0017-5749, pages 1403 - 1406, XP008072531 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1136/gut.31.12.1403 | - OKU T ET AL, "COMPARISON OF DIGESTIBILITY AND BREATH HYDROGEN GAS EXCRETION OF FRUCTO-OLIGOSACCHARIDE, GALACTOSYL-SUCROSE, AND ISOMALTO-OLIGOSACCHARIDE IN HEALTH HUMAN SUBJECTS", EUROPEAN JOURNAL OF CLINICAL NUTRITION, XX, XX, (20030901), vol. 57, no. 9, pages 1150 - 1156, XP008072521 | - MOZAFFAR, "purification and properties of f3-galactosidases from Bacilluscirculans", AGRICULTURAL AND BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, (1984), pages 3053 - 3061 | other | WO2005003329 | - MOZAFFAR et al., "Purification and Properties of gamma-Galactosidasesfrom Bacillus circulans", Agricultural and biological chemistry, (19840000), vol. 48, no. 12, pages 3053 - 3061, XP001312745 | - OSAMU et al., "Effect of galactooligosaccharides on calcium absorption and preventing bone loss in ovariectomized rats", Bioscience, biotechnology and biochemistry, (19950200), vol. 59, no. 2, pages 236 - 239, XP008023787 | - Tzortzis G. et al, "A novel galactooligosaccharide mixture increases the bifidobacterial population numbers in a continuous in vitro fermentation system and in the proximal colonic contents of pigs in vivo", Journal of nutrition, vol. 135, no. 7, pages 1726 - 1731, XP055273806 | - Bouhnik Y. et al, "Administration of transgalacto-oligosaccharides increases fecal bifidobacteria and modifies colonic fermentation metabolism in healthy humans", The journal of nutrition, vol. 127, no. 3, pages 444 - 448, XP002323067 | - JAN VAN LOO, The specificity of the interaction with intestinal bacterial fermentation by prebiotics determines their physiological efficacy, (20040000), vol. 17, pages 89 - 98, XP055359027 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1079/NRR200377 |