Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO9907516 | Global Dossier | 18.02.1999 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US90781097 | 08.08.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7040971 | Global Dossier | 09.05.2006 | B2 | US2005037698 | 17.02.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US86126097 | 21.05.1997 | US35332603 | 28.01.2003 | US73094400 | 05.12.2000 | US74567996 | 08.11.1996 | US7174502 | 08.02.2002 | US94618604 | 20.09.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6857946 | Global Dossier | 22.02.2005 | B2 | US2004033769 | 19.02.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US86126097 | 21.05.1997 | US35332603 | 28.01.2003 | US73094400 | 05.12.2000 | US74567996 | 08.11.1996 | US7174502 | 08.02.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4422325B | Global Dossier | 24.02.2010 | B2 | JP2001513451 | 04.09.2001 | A | Priority number | Date | US9816342 | 05.08.1998 | US90781097 | 08.08.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1258317 | Global Dossier | 09.03.2011 | B1 | EP1258317 | 20.11.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US86126097 | 21.05.1997 | US74567996 | 08.11.1996 | EP97308863 | 05.11.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1001864 | Global Dossier | 16.10.2002 | B1 | EP1001864 | 24.05.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US9816342 | 05.08.1998 | US90781097 | 08.08.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1754571 | Global Dossier | 29.07.2009 | B1 | EP1754571 | 21.02.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US86126097 | 21.05.1997 | US74567996 | 08.11.1996 | EP97308863 | 05.11.1997 | EP02078260 | 05.11.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69808774T | 12.06.2003 | T2 | DE69808774D1 | 21.11.2002 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US9816342 | 05.08.1998 | US90781097 | 08.08.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | TW478998B | 11.03.2002 | B | Priority number | Date | US90781097 | 08.08.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6386955 | 14.05.2002 | B2 | US2001000775 | 03.05.2001 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US86126097 | 21.05.1997 | US73094400 | 05.12.2000 | US74567996 | 08.11.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6511367 | 28.01.2003 | B2 | US2002072313 | 13.06.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US86126097 | 21.05.1997 | US5951902 | 28.01.2002 | US66583800 | 20.09.2000 | US74567996 | 08.11.1996 | US90781097 | 08.08.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6540594 | 01.04.2003 | B2 | US2002086624 | 04.07.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US86126097 | 21.05.1997 | US73094400 | 05.12.2000 | US74567996 | 08.11.1996 | US7174502 | 08.02.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6146259 | 14.11.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | US86126097 | 21.05.1997 | US74567996 | 08.11.1996 | US90781097 | 08.08.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6368191 | 09.04.2002 | B1 | Priority number | Date | US86126097 | 21.05.1997 | US66583800 | 20.09.2000 | US74567996 | 08.11.1996 | US90781097 | 08.08.1997 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP3439970B | Global Dossier | 25.08.2003 | B2 | JPH10180627 | 07.07.1998 | A | Priority number | Date | US86126097 | 21.05.1997 | US74567996 | 08.11.1996 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5216542B | Global Dossier | 19.06.2013 | B2 | JP2009065195 | 26.03.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | US86126097 | 21.05.1997 | US74567996 | 08.11.1996 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5068723B | Global Dossier | 07.11.2012 | B2 | JP2009033197 | 12.02.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | US86126097 | 21.05.1997 | US74567996 | 08.11.1996 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4940061B | Global Dossier | 30.05.2012 | B2 | JP2007335895 | 27.12.2007 | A | Priority number | Date | US86126097 | 21.05.1997 | US74567996 | 08.11.1996 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4368341B | Global Dossier | 18.11.2009 | B2 | JP2005328103 | 24.11.2005 | A | Priority number | Date | US86126097 | 21.05.1997 | US74567996 | 08.11.1996 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4233339B | Global Dossier | 04.03.2009 | B2 | JP2003264162 | 19.09.2003 | A | Priority number | Date | US86126097 | 21.05.1997 | US74567996 | 08.11.1996 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0841123 | Global Dossier | 29.01.2003 | B1 | EP0841123 | 13.05.1998 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US86126097 | 21.05.1997 | US74567996 | 08.11.1996 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69718750D1 | 06.03.2003 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US86126097 | 21.05.1997 | US74567996 | 08.11.1996 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69739521D1 | 10.09.2009 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US86126097 | 21.05.1997 | US74567996 | 08.11.1996 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69740146D1 | 21.04.2011 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US86126097 | 21.05.1997 | US74567996 | 08.11.1996 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR100366425B | 19.02.2003 | B1 | KR19980042123 | 17.08.1998 | A | Priority number | Date | US86126097 | 21.05.1997 | US74567996 | 08.11.1996 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | SG70042 | 25.01.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US86126097 | 21.05.1997 | US74567996 | 08.11.1996 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | SG87925 | 16.04.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US86126097 | 21.05.1997 | US74567996 | 08.11.1996 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | TW344694B | 11.11.1998 | B | Priority number | Date | US86126097 | 21.05.1997 | US74567996 | 08.11.1996 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6183354 | 06.02.2001 | B1 | Priority number | Date | US86126097 | 21.05.1997 | US74567996 | 08.11.1996 | Type | Earlier application | EP1258317 | EP0841123 |