EP1754571 - Retaining ring for a chemical mechanical polishing system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2007/08] | Retaining ring in a carrier head for a chemical mechanical polishing system | ||
[2009/10] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.06.2010 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.03.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 20.04.2011 [2011/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Applied Materials, Inc. 3050 Bowers Avenue Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2007/08] | For all designated states Applied Materials, Inc. 3050 Bowers Avenue Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Zunica, Steven M. 351 Los Robles Road Soquel, CA 95073 / US | 02 /
Chen, Hung Chih 1530 Oyama Place San Jose, CA 95131 / US | [2007/08] | Representative(s) | Frost, Alex John Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2007/08] | Frost, Alex John Boult Wade Tennant, Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | Application number, filing date | 06076591.4 | 05.11.1997 | [2007/08] | Priority number, date | US19960745679 | 08.11.1996 Original published format: US 745679 | US19970861260 | 21.05.1997 Original published format: US 861260 | [2007/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1754571 | Date: | 21.02.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1754571 | Date: | 29.07.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.01.2007 | Classification | IPC: | B24B37/04, B24B41/06 | [2007/08] | CPC: |
B24B37/30 (EP,US);
H01L21/304 (KR);
B24B37/32 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IE, IT, NL [2007/08] | Title | German: | Halterring für eine chemisch-mechanische Poliervorrichtung | [2007/08] | English: | Retaining ring for a chemical mechanical polishing system | [2009/10] | French: | Bague de maintien pour un dispositif de polissage mécano-chimique | [2007/08] |
Former [2007/08] | Retaining ring in a carrier head for a chemical mechanical polishing system | Examination procedure | 24.07.2007 | Examination requested [2007/36] | 24.07.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.09.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.01.2009 | Date of oral proceedings | 16.02.2009 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 18.02.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.03.2009 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 16.06.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 16.06.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP02078260.3 / EP1258317 | EP97308863.6 / EP0841123 | Opposition(s) | 03.05.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 17.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 17.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 17.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 19.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 06.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 07.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2006 | 10   M06   Fee paid on   19.02.2007 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 29.07.2009 | NL | 29.07.2009 | GB | 05.11.2009 | IE | 05.11.2009 | FR | 30.11.2009 | [2011/16] |
Former [2011/05] | NL | 29.07.2009 | |
GB | 05.11.2009 | ||
IE | 05.11.2009 | ||
FR | 30.11.2009 | ||
Former [2011/03] | NL | 29.07.2009 | |
IE | 05.11.2009 | ||
FR | 30.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/13] | NL | 29.07.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH08229808 (MITSUBISHI MATERIALS CORP) [A] 1,6 * abstract * |