EP1734529 - Disk recording medium, disk drive apparatus, reproducing method, and disk manufacturing method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.01.2013 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.01.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 06.02.2013 [2013/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Corporation 6-7-35 Kitashinagawa Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2006/51] | For all designated states SONY CORPORATION 6-7-35 Kitashinagawa Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kobayashi, Shoei, c/o Sony Corporation IP Departament, 6-7-35 Kitashinagawa Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo 141 / JP | [2012/09] |
Former [2006/51] | 01 /
Kobayashi, Shoei, c/o Sony Corporation IP Departament, 6-7-35 Kitashinagawa Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo 141 / JP | Representative(s) | Jackson, Jonathan Andrew, et al D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2006/51] | Jackson, Jonathan Andrew, et al D Young & Co 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | Application number, filing date | 06076594.8 | 04.10.2002 | [2006/51] | Priority number, date | JP20010311489 | 09.10.2001 Original published format: JP 2001311489 | [2006/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1734529 | Date: | 20.12.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/51] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1734529 | Date: | 30.05.2007 | [2007/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1734529 | Date: | 29.02.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.05.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G11B20/12, G11B20/14, G11B20/18, G11B20/00, G11B7/007, G11B7/24 | [2007/20] | CPC: |
G11B20/1217 (EP,US);
G11B7/007 (KR);
G11B20/1419 (EP,US);
G11B20/1833 (EP,US);
G11B20/22 (EP,US);
G11B27/24 (EP,US);
G11B7/0053 (EP,US);
G11B7/00736 (EP,US);
G11B7/24082 (EP,US);
G11B20/00086 (EP,US);
G11B20/00601 (EP,US);
G11B2020/1269 (EP,US);
G11B2020/1272 (EP,US);
G11B2020/1287 (EP,US);
G11B2020/1288 (EP,US);
G11B2020/1836 (EP,US);
G11B2020/1846 (EP,US);
G11B2220/216 (EP,US);
G11B2220/218 (EP,US);
G11B2220/2529 (EP,US);
G11B2220/2541 (EP,US);
G11B2220/2545 (EP,US);
G11B2220/2562 (EP,US);
G11B2220/2575 (EP,US);
G11B7/261 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2006/51] | G11B20/12, G11B7/007, G11B7/24, // G11B20/14, G11B20/18, G11B27/24, G11B20/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [2006/51] | Title | German: | Plattenaufzeichnungsmedium, Plattenlaufwerk, Wiedergabeverfahren und Plattenherstellungsverfahren | [2006/51] | English: | Disk recording medium, disk drive apparatus, reproducing method, and disk manufacturing method | [2006/51] | French: | Support d'enregistrement du disque, unité de disque, procédé de lecture et procédé de fabrication du disque | [2006/51] | Examination procedure | 17.08.2006 | Examination requested [2006/51] | 16.08.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.02.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.04.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.10.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.03.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.07.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.02.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 29.03.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.10.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 03.12.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.09.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.01.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 18.01.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP02800774.8 / EP1435607 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20020800774) is 05.03.2007 | Opposition(s) | 30.11.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 20.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0414516 (SONY CORP [JP]) [Y] 1-12 * column 4, lines 45-50 * * column 5, line 56 - column 6, line 13 *; | [Y] - NARAHARA T ET AL, "OPTICAL DISC SYSTEM FOR DIGITAL VIDEO RECORDING", JAPANESE JOURNAL OF APPLIED PHYSICS, JAPAN SOCIETY OF APPLIED PHYSICS, TOKYO, JP, (19990711), vol. 39, no. 2B, PART 1, ISSN 0021-4922, pages 912 - 919, XP001005912 [Y] 1-12 * pages 912-914 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1143/JJAP.39.912 | [A] - PROAKIS J G, Digital Communications, NEW YORK, US, MCGRAW HILL, (1989), XP002042235 [A] 6,7 * pages 172-183 * | [A] - KUIJPER M ET AL, "Groove-only recording under DVR conditions", OPTICAL DATA STORAGE 2001, PROC. SPIE VOL. 4342, (20010422), pages 178 - 185, XP002371452 [A] 6,7 * page 184 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1117/12.453401 | by applicant | EP0414516 | EP0973158 | - NARAHARA ET AL., "Optical Disc System for Digital Video Recording", JAPANESE JOURNAL OF APPLIED PHYSICS, (19990711), vol. 39, no. 2B, pages 912 - 919 |