EP1758403 - Video memory management for MPEG video decode and display system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.12.2014 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.12.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.01.2015 [2015/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ZORAN CORPORATION 3112 Scott Boulevard Santa Clara California 95054 / US | [2007/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gill, Aharon Aba Hushi Street 9 Haifa / IS | 02 /
Rosenthal, Elan Hag Street 19 Haifa / IS | 03 /
Fraenkel, Miri Shlomzion Street 24 Haifa / IS | 04 /
Ofir, Ram Zoran Coorporation 1390 Kifer Road Sunnyvale California 94036 / US | 05 /
Anisman, David 368 Cherry Avenue lOS aLTOS, ca 94022 / US | 06 /
Ironi, Alon Palmach Street 61 Haifa / IS | 07 /
Goldberg, Paul, R 744 lA Para Avenue Palo Aldto, CA 94306 / US | [2008/16] |
Former [2007/09] | 01 /
Gill, Aharon Aba Hushi Street 9 Haifa / IS | ||
02 /
Rosenthal, Elan Hag Street 19 Haifa / IS | |||
03 /
Fraenkel, Miri Shlomzion Street 24 Haifa / IS | |||
04 /
Ofir, Ram Harimon Street 7 Haifa / IS | |||
05 /
Anisman, David 368 Cherry Avenue lOS aLTOS, ca 94022 / US | |||
06 /
Ironi, Alon Palmach Street 61 Haifa / IS | |||
07 /
Goldberg, Paul, R 744 lA Para Avenue Palo Aldto, CA 94306 / US | Representative(s) | Hitchcock, Esmond Antony Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2007/09] | Hitchcock, Esmond Antony Lloyd Wise Commonwealth House, 1-19 New Oxford Street London WC1A 1LW / GB | Application number, filing date | 06076666.4 | 23.12.1998 | [2007/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1758403 | Date: | 28.02.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/09] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1758403 | Date: | 26.09.2007 | [2007/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.08.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H04N7/50 | [2007/39] | CPC: |
H04N19/423 (EP);
H04N19/44 (EP);
H04N19/61 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2007/15] | H04N7/50, H04N7/26 | ||
Former IPC [2007/09] | H04N7/50 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, NL [2007/09] | Title | German: | Videospeicherverwaltung für MPEG-Videodekodierungs- und Anzeige-system | [2007/16] | English: | Video memory management for MPEG video decode and display system | [2007/09] | French: | Gestion de mémoire vidéo pour système de décodage et d'affichage vidéo | [2007/09] |
Former [2007/09] | Videospeicherverwaltung für MPEG-Videodekodierungs- und -Anzeigesystem | Examination procedure | 04.09.2006 | Examination requested [2007/09] | 20.12.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.05.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.11.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.02.2011 | Date of oral proceedings | 07.03.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1} | 07.03.2011 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 01.07.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/04] | 11.09.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2015/04] | Appeal following examination | 16.05.2011 | Appeal received No. T1660/11 | 13.07.2011 | Statement of grounds filed | 24.11.2014 | Result of appeal procedure: the application was deemed to be withdrawn | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP98966072.5 / EP1142345 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP19980966072) is 19.07.2005 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 04.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 04.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 04.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 24.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 24.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 28.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 27.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 27.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 26.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2013 | 16   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5513301 (WAKASU YUTAKA [JP]) [A] 1-5,10-18,36-52 * column 3, line 41 - column 4, line 2 * * column 6, line 5 - line 42 * * figures 1,3 *; | [XA]US5561465 (FAUTIER THIERRY [FR], et al) [X] 19,20 * abstract * * column 2, line 19 - line 24 * * figure 4 * [A] 21-29; | [XA]US5635985 (BOYCE JILL M [US], et al) [X] 5,6,29,30 * column 3, line 13 - line 19 * * column 3, line 48 - line 49 * * column 11, line 3 - line 27 * [A] 8,9,31-35; | [XA]EP0778709 (SGS THOMSON MICROELECTRONICS [IT]) [X] 5,7,29,31 * abstract * [A] 6,9,30,32-35; | [XA]EP0794675 (KOKUSAI DENSHIN DENWA CO LTD [JP]) [X] 5,7,29,31 * figures 3,5 * * column 3, line 36 - column 4, line 47 * [A] 6,8,30,32-35; | [XA]EP0825781 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [X] 19,20,25-29 * abstract * * column 2, line 31 - line 49 * * column 3, line 48 - column 4, line 33 * * column 5, line 54 - column 6, line 51 * * column 7, line 48 - column 8, line 20 * * claims 1-10 * [A] 21,22; | [XA]EP0843485 (LSI LOGIC CORP [US]) [X] 5,19,20,29 * column 11, line 20 - column 12, line 17 * * column 13, line 27 - line 30 * * column 15, line 56 - column 16, line 39 * * figure 5 * [A] 6-9,21-28,30-35; | [XA] - CANTINEAU O ET AL, "ARCHITECTURE OF A MEMORY MANAGER FOR AN MPEG-2 VIDEO DECODING CIRCUIT", JOURNAL OF VLSI SIGNAL PROCESSING, (19981201), vol. 20, no. 3, ISSN 0922-5773, pages 251 - 265, XP000788432 [X] 19,20,23-28 * paragraph [04.2] * * paragraph [04.3] * * paragraph [4.5.1] * * figures 1,3-6,10,11 * [A] 1-5,10-18,21,22,29-52 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1023/A:1008083015934 | [A] - FOX S J ET AL, "MULITPLE ERROR CORRECTION ALGORITHM FOR HALFTONE, CONTINUOUS TONE AND TEXT REPRODUCTION", IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, (19810301), vol. 23, no. 10, ISSN 0018-8689, pages 4433 - 4435, XP002032501 [A] 5-9,29-35 * page 4433 * | by applicant | US5646693 |