Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
03.10.2008 | Change - representative | published on 05.11.2008 [2008/45] |
08.08.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 10.09.2008 [2008/37] |
06.06.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.07.2008 [2008/28] |
02.04.2008 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | |
08.02.2008 | Definitive list of designations | published on 12.03.2008 [2008/11] |
07.02.2008 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | |
01.06.2007 | Publication of search report | published on 04.07.2007 [2007/27] |
27.04.2007 | Change - classification | published on 30.05.2007 [2007/22] |
27.04.2007 | Change - classification | published on 30.05.2007 [2007/22] |
09.03.2007 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 11.04.2007 [2007/15] |
07.11.2006 | New entry: Renewal fee paid |