EP1785661 - Apparatus to support a display device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.08.2010 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.10.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 09.11.2011 [2011/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416 Maetan-Dong Yeongtong-Gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-Do / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2007/20] | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416 Maetan-Dong Yeongtong-Gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-Do / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Park, Jae-hoo Dongsuwon LG Village No. 206-1703 Mangpo-dong Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | [2007/20] | Representative(s) | Hylarides, Paul Jacques, et al Arnold & Siedsma Bezuidenhoutseweg 57 2594 AC Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2007/20] | Hylarides, Paul Jacques, et al Arnold & Siedsma, Sweelinckplein 1 2517 GK The Hague / NL | Application number, filing date | 06076962.7 | 01.11.2006 | [2007/20] | Priority number, date | KR20050108310 | 12.11.2005 Original published format: KR 20050108310 | [2007/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1785661 | Date: | 16.05.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/20] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1785661 | Date: | 26.03.2008 | [2008/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1785661 | Date: | 07.10.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.02.2008 | Classification | IPC: | F16M11/12 | [2007/20] | CPC: |
F16M11/12 (EP,US);
H04N5/655 (KR);
F16M11/2071 (EP,US);
F16M13/027 (EP,US);
F16M2200/041 (EP,US);
Y10S248/917 (EP,US);
Y10S248/92 (EP,US);
Y10S248/921 (EP,US);
Y10S248/922 (EP,US);
Y10S248/923 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/20] | Title | German: | Einrichtung zum Tragen einer Anzeigevorrichtung | [2007/20] | English: | Apparatus to support a display device | [2007/20] | French: | Dispositif de support d'un appareil de visualisation | [2007/20] | Examination procedure | 05.09.2008 | Examination requested [2008/43] | 17.10.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.02.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.05.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.06.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 08.06.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.07.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 07.10.2009 | BE | 07.10.2009 | CY | 07.10.2009 | CZ | 07.10.2009 | DK | 07.10.2009 | EE | 07.10.2009 | FI | 07.10.2009 | IT | 07.10.2009 | LT | 07.10.2009 | LV | 07.10.2009 | PL | 07.10.2009 | RO | 07.10.2009 | SE | 07.10.2009 | SI | 07.10.2009 | SK | 07.10.2009 | TR | 07.10.2009 | IE | 01.11.2009 | LU | 01.11.2009 | MC | 30.11.2009 | FR | 07.12.2009 | BG | 07.01.2010 | GR | 08.01.2010 | ES | 18.01.2010 | IS | 07.02.2010 | PT | 08.02.2010 | HU | 08.04.2010 | [2011/44] |
Former [2011/32] | AT | 07.10.2009 | |
BE | 07.10.2009 | ||
CZ | 07.10.2009 | ||
DK | 07.10.2009 | ||
EE | 07.10.2009 | ||
FI | 07.10.2009 | ||
IT | 07.10.2009 | ||
LT | 07.10.2009 | ||
LV | 07.10.2009 | ||
PL | 07.10.2009 | ||
RO | 07.10.2009 | ||
SE | 07.10.2009 | ||
SI | 07.10.2009 | ||
SK | 07.10.2009 | ||
IE | 01.11.2009 | ||
LU | 01.11.2009 | ||
MC | 30.11.2009 | ||
FR | 07.12.2009 | ||
BG | 07.01.2010 | ||
GR | 08.01.2010 | ||
ES | 18.01.2010 | ||
IS | 07.02.2010 | ||
PT | 08.02.2010 | ||
HU | 08.04.2010 | ||
Former [2011/22] | AT | 07.10.2009 | |
BE | 07.10.2009 | ||
CZ | 07.10.2009 | ||
DK | 07.10.2009 | ||
EE | 07.10.2009 | ||
FI | 07.10.2009 | ||
IT | 07.10.2009 | ||
LT | 07.10.2009 | ||
LV | 07.10.2009 | ||
PL | 07.10.2009 | ||
RO | 07.10.2009 | ||
SE | 07.10.2009 | ||
SI | 07.10.2009 | ||
SK | 07.10.2009 | ||
IE | 01.11.2009 | ||
LU | 01.11.2009 | ||
MC | 30.11.2009 | ||
FR | 07.12.2009 | ||
BG | 07.01.2010 | ||
GR | 08.01.2010 | ||
ES | 18.01.2010 | ||
IS | 07.02.2010 | ||
PT | 08.02.2010 | ||
Former [2011/16] | AT | 07.10.2009 | |
BE | 07.10.2009 | ||
CZ | 07.10.2009 | ||
DK | 07.10.2009 | ||
EE | 07.10.2009 | ||
FI | 07.10.2009 | ||
IT | 07.10.2009 | ||
LT | 07.10.2009 | ||
LV | 07.10.2009 | ||
PL | 07.10.2009 | ||
RO | 07.10.2009 | ||
SE | 07.10.2009 | ||
SI | 07.10.2009 | ||
SK | 07.10.2009 | ||
IE | 01.11.2009 | ||
MC | 30.11.2009 | ||
FR | 07.12.2009 | ||
BG | 07.01.2010 | ||
GR | 08.01.2010 | ||
ES | 18.01.2010 | ||
IS | 07.02.2010 | ||
PT | 08.02.2010 | ||
Former [2011/03] | AT | 07.10.2009 | |
BE | 07.10.2009 | ||
CZ | 07.10.2009 | ||
DK | 07.10.2009 | ||
EE | 07.10.2009 | ||
FI | 07.10.2009 | ||
LT | 07.10.2009 | ||
LV | 07.10.2009 | ||
PL | 07.10.2009 | ||
RO | 07.10.2009 | ||
SE | 07.10.2009 | ||
SI | 07.10.2009 | ||
SK | 07.10.2009 | ||
IE | 01.11.2009 | ||
MC | 30.11.2009 | ||
FR | 07.12.2009 | ||
BG | 07.01.2010 | ||
GR | 08.01.2010 | ||
ES | 18.01.2010 | ||
IS | 07.02.2010 | ||
PT | 08.02.2010 | ||
Former [2010/41] | AT | 07.10.2009 | |
BE | 07.10.2009 | ||
CZ | 07.10.2009 | ||
DK | 07.10.2009 | ||
EE | 07.10.2009 | ||
FI | 07.10.2009 | ||
LT | 07.10.2009 | ||
LV | 07.10.2009 | ||
PL | 07.10.2009 | ||
RO | 07.10.2009 | ||
SE | 07.10.2009 | ||
SI | 07.10.2009 | ||
SK | 07.10.2009 | ||
MC | 30.11.2009 | ||
BG | 07.01.2010 | ||
ES | 18.01.2010 | ||
IS | 07.02.2010 | ||
PT | 08.02.2010 | ||
Former [2010/30] | AT | 07.10.2009 | |
BE | 07.10.2009 | ||
FI | 07.10.2009 | ||
LT | 07.10.2009 | ||
LV | 07.10.2009 | ||
PL | 07.10.2009 | ||
SE | 07.10.2009 | ||
SI | 07.10.2009 | ||
MC | 30.11.2009 | ||
ES | 18.01.2010 | ||
IS | 07.02.2010 | ||
PT | 08.02.2010 | ||
Former [2010/29] | AT | 07.10.2009 | |
BE | 07.10.2009 | ||
FI | 07.10.2009 | ||
LT | 07.10.2009 | ||
LV | 07.10.2009 | ||
PL | 07.10.2009 | ||
SE | 07.10.2009 | ||
SI | 07.10.2009 | ||
ES | 18.01.2010 | ||
IS | 07.02.2010 | ||
PT | 08.02.2010 | ||
Former [2010/25] | FI | 07.10.2009 | |
LT | 07.10.2009 | ||
LV | 07.10.2009 | ||
PL | 07.10.2009 | ||
SE | 07.10.2009 | ||
SI | 07.10.2009 | ||
ES | 18.01.2010 | ||
IS | 07.02.2010 | ||
PT | 08.02.2010 | ||
Former [2010/19] | SI | 07.10.2009 | |
ES | 18.01.2010 | ||
Former [2010/16] | SI | 07.10.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]DE19532778 (ULLRICH CHRISTIAN [DE]) [X] 1-3,6,14,35 * column 5, line 59 - column 7, line 10; figures 1,2 * [A] 27; | [AX]JP2004053708 (FUJITSU GENERAL LTD) [A] 1,27 * abstract * [X] 35; | [AX]US2004155167 (CARTER JEFF [US]) [A] 1,27 * paragraph [0030] - paragraph [0035]; figures 2A-4 * [X] 35; | [AX]DE202004018366U (RECHNET GMBH [DE]) [A] 1,27 * paragraph [0026] - paragraph [0032]; figure 1 *[X] 35; | [YXA]US2005092890 (LIAO JUNG H [TW]) [Y] 1,2 * the whole document * [X] 35 [A] 6,27; | [Y]US2005236543 (O'NEIL EDWARD L [US]) [Y] 1,2 * paragraph [0022] - paragraph [0027]; figures 1,6-8,11-14 * | by applicant | DE19532778 | US2005092890 | US2005236543 |