EP1787905 - Aircraft trailing edge devices, including devices having forwardly positioned hinge lines, and associated methods [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.07.2014 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG, HU, LU | published on 26.08.2015 [2015/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Boeing Company 100 North Riverside Plaza Chicago, IL 60606-1596 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2013/35] | For all designated states The Boeing Company 100 North Riverside Plaza Chicago, IL 60606-2016 / US | ||
Former [2007/21] | For all designated states The Boeing Company 100 North Riverside Plaza Chicago IL 60606-2016 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lacy, Douglas S. 17100 105th Avenue NE Bothell, WA 98011 / US | 02 /
Dovey, John V. 10539 Palatine Avenue N Seattle, WA 98133 / US | 03 /
Sakurai, Seiya 210 17th Avenue S Seattle, WA 98144 / US | 04 /
Kordel, Jan A. 4 Meredith St. Sandringham VIC 3191 / AU | 05 /
Balzer, Michael A. 10510 NE 58th St. Kirkland, WA 98033 / US | 06 /
Huynh, Neal V. 15768 SE 58th PI Bellevue, WA 98006 / US | [2013/15] |
Former [2007/26] | 01 /
Lacy, Douglas S. 17100 105th Avenue NE Bothell, WA 98011 / US | ||
02 /
Dovey, John V. 10539 Palatine Avenue N Seattle, WA 98133 / US | |||
03 /
Sakurai, Seiya 210 17th Avenue S Seattle, WA 98144 / US | |||
04 /
Kordel, Jan A. 4 Meredith St. Sandringham VIC 3191 / US | |||
05 /
Balzer, Michael A. 10510 NE 58th St. Kirkland, WA 98033 / US | |||
06 /
Huynh, Neal V. 15768 SE 58th PI Bellevue, WA 98006 / US | |||
Former [2007/21] | 01 /
Lacy, Douglas S. 17100 105th Avenue NE Bothell, WA 98011 / US | ||
02 /
Dovey, John V. 10539 Palatine Avenue N Seattle, WA 98133 / US | |||
03 /
Sakurai, Seiya 210 17th Avenue S Seattle, WA 98144 / US | |||
04 /
Kordel, Jan A. 5003 159th Ct NE Redmond, WA 98052 / US | |||
05 /
Balzer, Michael A. 10510 NE 58th St. Kirkland, WA 98033 / US | |||
06 /
Huynh, Neal V. 15768 SE 58th PI Bellevue, WA 98006 / US | Representative(s) | Bartelds, Erik, et al Arnold & Siedsma Bezuidenhoutseweg 57 2594 AC The Hague / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2011/34] | Bartelds, Erik, et al Arnold & Siedsma Sweelinckplein 1 2517 GK Den Haag / NL | ||
Former [2007/21] | Land, Addick Adrianus Gosling, et al Arnold & Siedsma Sweelinckplein 1 2517 GK Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 06077060.9 | 20.11.2006 | [2007/21] | Priority number, date | US20050284113 | 21.11.2005 Original published format: US 284113 | [2007/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1787905 | Date: | 23.05.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/21] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1787905 | Date: | 22.12.2010 | [2010/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1787905 | Date: | 28.08.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.11.2010 | Classification | IPC: | B64C9/16, B64C9/18 | [2013/14] | CPC: |
B64C9/16 (EP,US);
B64C9/18 (EP,US);
Y02T50/30 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2007/21] | B64C9/02, B64C9/18 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/21] | Title | German: | Hinterkantenklappenvorrichtungen für ein Flugzeug, einschliesslich Vorrichtungen mit nach vorne angeordnete Drehachse, und entsprechende Verfahren | [2007/21] | English: | Aircraft trailing edge devices, including devices having forwardly positioned hinge lines, and associated methods | [2007/21] | French: | Dispositifs de volet hypersustentateur de bord de fuite pour avion, y compris des dispositifs avec des axes d'articulation positionnés vers l'avant, et procédés correspondants | [2007/21] | Examination procedure | 25.02.2011 | Examination requested [2011/14] | 22.06.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.09.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.01.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.03.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.07.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 19.07.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP13181322.2 / EP2690006 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.09.2011 | Opposition(s) | 30.05.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 20.11.2006 | AT | 28.08.2013 | BE | 28.08.2013 | BG | 28.08.2013 | CY | 28.08.2013 | CZ | 28.08.2013 | DK | 28.08.2013 | EE | 28.08.2013 | ES | 28.08.2013 | FI | 28.08.2013 | IT | 28.08.2013 | LT | 28.08.2013 | LV | 28.08.2013 | MC | 28.08.2013 | NL | 28.08.2013 | PL | 28.08.2013 | RO | 28.08.2013 | SE | 28.08.2013 | SI | 28.08.2013 | SK | 28.08.2013 | TR | 28.08.2013 | IE | 20.11.2013 | LU | 20.11.2013 | GR | 29.11.2013 | CH | 30.11.2013 | LI | 30.11.2013 | IS | 28.12.2013 | PT | 30.12.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | AT | 28.08.2013 | |
BE | 28.08.2013 | ||
CY | 28.08.2013 | ||
CZ | 28.08.2013 | ||
DK | 28.08.2013 | ||
EE | 28.08.2013 | ||
ES | 28.08.2013 | ||
FI | 28.08.2013 | ||
IT | 28.08.2013 | ||
LT | 28.08.2013 | ||
LV | 28.08.2013 | ||
MC | 28.08.2013 | ||
NL | 28.08.2013 | ||
PL | 28.08.2013 | ||
RO | 28.08.2013 | ||
SE | 28.08.2013 | ||
SI | 28.08.2013 | ||
SK | 28.08.2013 | ||
TR | 28.08.2013 | ||
IE | 20.11.2013 | ||
GR | 29.11.2013 | ||
CH | 30.11.2013 | ||
LI | 30.11.2013 | ||
IS | 28.12.2013 | ||
PT | 30.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/48] | AT | 28.08.2013 | |
BE | 28.08.2013 | ||
CY | 28.08.2013 | ||
CZ | 28.08.2013 | ||
DK | 28.08.2013 | ||
EE | 28.08.2013 | ||
ES | 28.08.2013 | ||
FI | 28.08.2013 | ||
IT | 28.08.2013 | ||
LT | 28.08.2013 | ||
LV | 28.08.2013 | ||
MC | 28.08.2013 | ||
NL | 28.08.2013 | ||
PL | 28.08.2013 | ||
RO | 28.08.2013 | ||
SE | 28.08.2013 | ||
SI | 28.08.2013 | ||
SK | 28.08.2013 | ||
IE | 20.11.2013 | ||
GR | 29.11.2013 | ||
CH | 30.11.2013 | ||
LI | 30.11.2013 | ||
IS | 28.12.2013 | ||
PT | 30.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/34] | AT | 28.08.2013 | |
BE | 28.08.2013 | ||
CY | 28.08.2013 | ||
CZ | 28.08.2013 | ||
DK | 28.08.2013 | ||
EE | 28.08.2013 | ||
ES | 28.08.2013 | ||
FI | 28.08.2013 | ||
IT | 28.08.2013 | ||
LT | 28.08.2013 | ||
LV | 28.08.2013 | ||
MC | 28.08.2013 | ||
NL | 28.08.2013 | ||
PL | 28.08.2013 | ||
RO | 28.08.2013 | ||
SE | 28.08.2013 | ||
SI | 28.08.2013 | ||
SK | 28.08.2013 | ||
GR | 29.11.2013 | ||
CH | 30.11.2013 | ||
LI | 30.11.2013 | ||
IS | 28.12.2013 | ||
PT | 30.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/33] | AT | 28.08.2013 | |
BE | 28.08.2013 | ||
CY | 28.08.2013 | ||
CZ | 28.08.2013 | ||
DK | 28.08.2013 | ||
EE | 28.08.2013 | ||
ES | 28.08.2013 | ||
FI | 28.08.2013 | ||
IT | 28.08.2013 | ||
LT | 28.08.2013 | ||
LV | 28.08.2013 | ||
MC | 28.08.2013 | ||
NL | 28.08.2013 | ||
PL | 28.08.2013 | ||
RO | 28.08.2013 | ||
SE | 28.08.2013 | ||
SI | 28.08.2013 | ||
SK | 28.08.2013 | ||
GR | 29.11.2013 | ||
IS | 28.12.2013 | ||
PT | 30.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/24] | AT | 28.08.2013 | |
BE | 28.08.2013 | ||
CY | 28.08.2013 | ||
CZ | 28.08.2013 | ||
DK | 28.08.2013 | ||
EE | 28.08.2013 | ||
ES | 28.08.2013 | ||
FI | 28.08.2013 | ||
IT | 28.08.2013 | ||
LT | 28.08.2013 | ||
LV | 28.08.2013 | ||
NL | 28.08.2013 | ||
PL | 28.08.2013 | ||
RO | 28.08.2013 | ||
SE | 28.08.2013 | ||
SI | 28.08.2013 | ||
SK | 28.08.2013 | ||
GR | 29.11.2013 | ||
IS | 28.12.2013 | ||
PT | 30.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/23] | AT | 28.08.2013 | |
BE | 28.08.2013 | ||
CY | 28.08.2013 | ||
CZ | 28.08.2013 | ||
DK | 28.08.2013 | ||
EE | 28.08.2013 | ||
FI | 28.08.2013 | ||
LT | 28.08.2013 | ||
LV | 28.08.2013 | ||
NL | 28.08.2013 | ||
PL | 28.08.2013 | ||
RO | 28.08.2013 | ||
SE | 28.08.2013 | ||
SI | 28.08.2013 | ||
SK | 28.08.2013 | ||
GR | 29.11.2013 | ||
IS | 28.12.2013 | ||
PT | 30.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/22] | AT | 28.08.2013 | |
BE | 28.08.2013 | ||
CY | 28.08.2013 | ||
DK | 28.08.2013 | ||
FI | 28.08.2013 | ||
LT | 28.08.2013 | ||
LV | 28.08.2013 | ||
NL | 28.08.2013 | ||
PL | 28.08.2013 | ||
RO | 28.08.2013 | ||
SE | 28.08.2013 | ||
SI | 28.08.2013 | ||
GR | 29.11.2013 | ||
IS | 28.12.2013 | ||
PT | 30.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 28.08.2013 | |
BE | 28.08.2013 | ||
CY | 28.08.2013 | ||
DK | 28.08.2013 | ||
FI | 28.08.2013 | ||
LT | 28.08.2013 | ||
LV | 28.08.2013 | ||
PL | 28.08.2013 | ||
SE | 28.08.2013 | ||
SI | 28.08.2013 | ||
GR | 29.11.2013 | ||
IS | 28.12.2013 | ||
PT | 30.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/18] | AT | 28.08.2013 | |
BE | 28.08.2013 | ||
CY | 28.08.2013 | ||
FI | 28.08.2013 | ||
LT | 28.08.2013 | ||
LV | 28.08.2013 | ||
PL | 28.08.2013 | ||
SE | 28.08.2013 | ||
SI | 28.08.2013 | ||
GR | 29.11.2013 | ||
IS | 28.12.2013 | ||
PT | 30.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/14] | CY | 17.07.2013 | |
AT | 28.08.2013 | ||
BE | 28.08.2013 | ||
FI | 28.08.2013 | ||
LT | 28.08.2013 | ||
LV | 28.08.2013 | ||
PL | 28.08.2013 | ||
SE | 28.08.2013 | ||
SI | 28.08.2013 | ||
GR | 29.11.2013 | ||
IS | 28.12.2013 | ||
PT | 30.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/12] | CY | 17.07.2013 | |
AT | 28.08.2013 | ||
FI | 28.08.2013 | ||
LT | 28.08.2013 | ||
LV | 28.08.2013 | ||
PL | 28.08.2013 | ||
SE | 28.08.2013 | ||
SI | 28.08.2013 | ||
GR | 29.11.2013 | ||
IS | 28.12.2013 | ||
PT | 30.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | CY | 17.07.2013 | |
AT | 28.08.2013 | ||
FI | 28.08.2013 | ||
LT | 28.08.2013 | ||
PL | 28.08.2013 | ||
SE | 28.08.2013 | ||
IS | 28.12.2013 | ||
PT | 30.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | CY | 17.07.2013 | |
AT | 28.08.2013 | ||
LT | 28.08.2013 | ||
SE | 28.08.2013 | ||
IS | 28.12.2013 | ||
PT | 30.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | AT | 28.08.2013 | |
LT | 28.08.2013 | ||
SE | 28.08.2013 | ||
PT | 30.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | LT | 28.08.2013 | |
PT | 30.12.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [E]EP1926660 (AIRBUS OPERATIONS GMBH [DE]) [E] 1-20 * paragraphs [0001] , [0002] , [0014] , [0016] * * paragraphs [0049] - [0072] * * figure - *; | [X]US2005011994 (SAKURAI SEIYA [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4-8,11-20 * paragraphs [0003] - [0007] * * paragraphs [0017] - [0028] * * paragraph [0037] * * paragraphs [0040] - [0046] * * paragraph [0049] * * figure - *; | [X]US4395008 (SHARROCK BARRY [GB], et al) [X] 1,2,4,6-8,11-13,15-20 * the whole document *; | [X]US4784355 (BRINE GERALD T [US]) [X] 1-3,6-10,15-18,20 * the whole document * | by applicant | EP1926660 | US2005011994 | US4395008 | US4784355 |