EP1942478 - Printable foil [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.02.2012 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.02.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.03.2012 [2012/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MultiSTiq International Coating B.V. D.J. Bunschotenstraat 14 7471 CZ Goor / NL | [2008/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
De Beurs, Mark Udo Hullekesbergseweg 1 6994 CG De Steeg / NL | 02 /
Gering, Paulus Gerardus Klaas de Rookstraat 42 7558 DG Hengelo / NL | [2008/28] | Representative(s) | 't Jong, Bastiaan Jacob, et al Arnold & Siedsma Bezuidenhoutseweg 57 2594 AC The Hague / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2008/28] | 't Jong, Bastiaan Jacob, et al Arnold & Siedsma Sweelinckplein 1 2517 GK Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 06077323.1 | 27.12.2006 | [2008/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1942478 | Date: | 09.07.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.06.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G09F11/12, C09J7/02 | [2008/28] | CPC: |
G09F11/12 (EP);
G09F11/15 (EP);
G09F19/22 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/28] | Title | German: | Bedruckbare Folie | [2008/28] | English: | Printable foil | [2008/28] | French: | Film imprimable | [2008/28] | Examination procedure | 24.12.2008 | Examination requested [2009/08] | 04.02.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.08.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.08.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.12.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.03.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.09.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/11] | 24.10.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2012/11] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.02.2009 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2011 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]AU745427B (DECAD LTD) [X] 1-11 * claim 1 *; | [X]DE20314621U (RADDE WOLF DIETER [DE]) [X] 1-11 * claims 1,2 *; | [X]DE202004014869U (HOERL HERBERT [DE]) [X] 1-11 * claim 1 *; | [X]EP1108768 (TYCO INTERNAT US INC [US]) [X] 1,5-7 * claims 1-3 *; | [X]DE4303616 (NESCHEN HANS GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [X] 1,3,6 * claims 1,3,7,8 * |