EP1772151 - Method for the synthesis of BCH-189 (2',3'-dideoxy-3'-thia-cytidine) [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2007/15] | Method and compositions for the synthesis of bch-189 and related compounds | ||
[2015/11] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.12.2015 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.12.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.01.2016 [2016/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Emory University 1364 Clifton Road, N.E., Box M-11 Atlanta, GA 30322 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2007/15] | For all designated states EMORY UNIVERSITY 1364 Clifton Road, N.E., Box M-11 Atlanta, GA 30322 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Liotta, Dennis C. 251 Montrose Drive McDonough, Georgia 30253 / US | 02 /
Choi, Woo-Baeg 6300 Riverside Dr. Sandy Spring, Georgia 30328 / US | 03 /
Schinazi, Raymond F. 1524 Regency Walk Drive Decatur, Georgia 30033 / US | [2007/50] |
Former [2007/15] | 01 /
Liotta, Dennis C. 251 Montrose Drive McDonough, Georgia 30253 / US | ||
02 /
Choi, Woo-Baeg 3215A Flowers Road S. Atlanta, Georgia 30342 / US | |||
03 /
Schinazi, Raymond F. 1524 Regency Walk Drive Decatur, Georgia 30033 / US | Representative(s) | Hallybone, Huw George, et al Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2007/15] | Hallybone, Huw George, et al Carpmaels and Ransford, 43 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 06077328.0 | 31.01.1991 | [2007/15] | Priority number, date | US19900473318 | 01.02.1990 Original published format: US 473318 | [2007/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1772151 | Date: | 11.04.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/15] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1772151 | Date: | 13.06.2007 | [2007/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.05.2007 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/505, C07D327/04, C07D411/04, C07D405/04, C07H19/06, C07H19/10 | [2015/11] | CPC: |
C07D405/04 (EP,US);
C07D411/04 (EP,KR,US);
A61P31/12 (EP);
A61P31/18 (EP);
C07D327/04 (EP,US);
C07H19/06 (EP,US);
C07H19/10 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2007/24] | A61K31/505, C07D239/02, C07D411/04 | ||
Former IPC [2007/15] | A61K31/505 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [2007/15] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Synthese von BCH-189 (2',3'-Didesoxy-3'-thia-cytidin) | [2015/11] | English: | Method for the synthesis of BCH-189 (2',3'-dideoxy-3'-thia-cytidine) | [2015/11] | French: | Procédé de la synthèse de BCH-189 (2',3'-dideoxy-3'-thia-cytidine) | [2015/11] |
Former [2007/15] | Verfahren und Zusammensetzungen zur Synthese von bch-189 und verwandten Verbindungen | ||
Former [2007/15] | Method and compositions for the synthesis of bch-189 and related compounds | ||
Former [2007/15] | Procédé et compositions de la synthèse bch-189 et composants associés | Examination procedure | 23.11.2007 | Examination requested [2008/01] | 01.02.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.11.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.01.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.07.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.03.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.07.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/04] | 04.09.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2016/04] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP91904454.5 / EP0513200 | EP98201737.8 / EP0872237 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP19910904454) is 09.06.1997 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 27.11.2008 | Request for further processing filed | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 28.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 28.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 28.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 28.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 28.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 28.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 28.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 16 | 28.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 17 | 30.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 18 | 14.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 19 | 13.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 20 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4000137 (DVONCH WILLIAM, et al); | [A]US4336381 (NAGATA WATARU, et al); | [A]EP0337713 (IAF BIOCHEM INT [CA]); | [PX]EP0382526 (IAF BIOCHEM INT [CA]); |