EP1681050 - Dispersible sustained release pharmaceutical compositions [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.12.2009 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.12.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.01.2010 [2010/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Strides Arcolab Limited 201, Devavrata Sector 17, Vashi Navi Mumbai 400 703 / IN | [2006/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Singh, Kamalinder Kaur C.U. Shah College of Pharmacy SNDT Women's Univers 400 049, Maharashtra / IN | 02 /
Dahiwal, Madhuri C.U. Shah College of Pharmacy SNDT Women's Univers 400 049, Maharashtra / IN | [2006/29] | Representative(s) | Brand, Thomas Louis WP Thompson 138 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/49] | Brand, Thomas Louis W.P. Thompson & Co. 55 Drury Lane London WC2B 5SQ / GB | ||
Former [2006/29] | Brand, Thomas Louis W.P. Thompson & Co., 55 Drury Lane London WC2B 5SQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 06100300.0 | 12.01.2006 | [2006/29] | Priority number, date | INMU08802004 | 13.01.2005 Original published format: IN MU08802004 | [2006/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1681050 | Date: | 19.07.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.03.2006 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/20, A61K9/36, A61K31/43, A61K31/546, A61P31/04 | [2006/29] | CPC: |
A61K9/0056 (EP,US);
A61K31/43 (EP,US);
A61K31/546 (EP,US);
A61K9/2077 (EP,US);
A61P31/04 (EP);
A61K9/1652 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/29] | Title | German: | Dispergierbare pharmazeutische Zusammensetzung mit verzögerter Freisetzung | [2006/29] | English: | Dispersible sustained release pharmaceutical compositions | [2006/29] | French: | Composition pharmaceutique dispersible avec libération prolongée | [2006/29] | Examination procedure | 10.01.2007 | Examination requested [2007/08] | 23.02.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.06.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.01.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.07.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.07.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.08.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/04] | 04.09.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2010/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2009 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2004047808 (LEK PHARMACEUTICALS [SI], et al) [X] 1,2,5-8,10,11,13,16 * page 2, line 9 - line 16 * * page 4, paragraph 2 * * page 10; example 1 *; | [X]US2004005361 (KHANDELWAL SANJEEV [IN], et al) [X] 1,2,5-8,10,15,17 * page 3; example 1 * * page 4, paragraph 57 - paragraph 59 *; | [X]WO2004073695 (LEK PHARMACEUTICALS [SI], et al) [X] 1,2,6,7,10,12,15,16 * page 2, paragraph 3 * * page 21 - page 22; example 4 * * claim 22 *; | [X]WO2004019901 (ORCHID CHEMICALS & PHARM LTD [IN], et al) [X] 1,2,6-8,10,15 * page 19; example 1 * * page 34, line 11 - line 14 *; | [X]US6136345 (GRIMMETT FRANCIS WALTER [GB], et al) [X] 1,6,7,9,10,16 * column 5 - column 6; example 1 *; | [X]US5837292 (DIJKGRAAF BERNARDUS LEONARDUS [NL], et al) [X] 1,2,5-8,14,16 * column 4, line 45 - line 60 * * column 6; example 15 *; | [X]EP1226818 (PFIZER PROD INC [US]) [X] 1,3-5,8,10,16 * page 5, paragraph 47 - page 6, paragraph 50 *; | [X]US2003232077 (DAGGY BRUCE P [US], et al) [X] 1-3,5,8-10 * page 2, paragraph 15 * * page 2, paragraph 42 * * examples 7,8 *; | [X]FR2116M (VITAMIX PHARMACEUTICALS [US]) [X] 1,2,5,6,8,10 * page 1, column 2 * * page 2, paragraph 1 *; | [X]US5650169 (CONTE UBALDO [IT], et al) [X] 1-5,8-10 * column 13 - column 14; example 5 * | by applicant | EP0313328 | EP0052075 | US4988679 | US5780055 | - F. E. J. SENDALL, PHARMACEUTICAL JOURNAL, (19830312), pages 289 - 294 |