EP1683913 - Twin-wire former [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.10.2007 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.10.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.11.2007 [2007/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Voith Patent GmbH St. Pöltener Str. 43 89522 Heidenheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/37] | For all designated states Voith Patent GmbH Sankt Pöltener Strasse 43 89522 Heidenheim / DE | ||
Former [2006/30] | For all designated states Voith Paper Patent GmbH Sankt Pöltener Strasse 43 89522 Heidenheim / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rühl, Thomas Liebigstr. 7 73249 Wernau / DE | [2006/30] | Representative(s) | Kunze, Klaus, et al Voith Paper Holding GmbH & Co. KG Abteilung zjp Sankt Poeltener Strasse 43 89522 Heidenheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/37] | Kunze, Klaus, et al Voith Paper Holding GmbH & Co. KG Abteilung zjp Sankt Pöltener Strasse 43 89522 Heidenheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 06100361.2 | 16.01.2006 | [2006/30] | Priority number, date | DE20051003531 | 25.01.2005 Original published format: DE102005003531 | [2006/30] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1683913 | Date: | 26.07.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.05.2006 | Classification | IPC: | D21F9/00 | [2006/30] | CPC: |
D21F3/045 (EP);
D21F9/003 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2007/15] |
Former [2006/30] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Doppelsiebformer | [2006/30] | English: | Twin-wire former | [2006/30] | French: | Section de formage à deux toiles | [2006/30] | Examination procedure | 27.01.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/48] | 31.05.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2007/48] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 12.03.2007 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 12.03.2007 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 12.03.2007 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 12.03.2007 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 12.03.2007 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 12.03.2007 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 12.03.2007 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 12.03.2007 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 12.03.2007 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 12.03.2007 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 12.03.2007 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 12.03.2007 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 12.03.2007 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 12.03.2007 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 12.03.2007 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 12.03.2007 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 12.03.2007 | IS   M01   Not yet paid | 12.03.2007 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 12.03.2007 | LT   M01   Not yet paid | 12.03.2007 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 12.03.2007 | LV   M01   Not yet paid | 12.03.2007 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 12.03.2007 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 12.03.2007 | PL   M01   Not yet paid | 12.03.2007 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 12.03.2007 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 12.03.2007 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 12.03.2007 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 12.03.2007 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 12.03.2007 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 12.03.2007 | M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP1083260 (VOITH PAPER PATENT GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-7,10-13 * paragraph [0022] - paragraph [0040]; figures 2,3 *; | [X]EP1319745 (VOITH PAPER PATENT GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-3,6-8,10-12 * paragraph [0031] - paragraph [0054]; figure 2 *; | [X]US5914009 (KOTITSCHKE GERHARD [DE]) [X] 1,2,4-7,9-12 * column 1, line 54 - column 4, line 2; figure 2 *; | [XD]DE10106731 (VOITH PAPER PATENT GMBH [DE]) [XD] 1,4,6,8-12 * paragraph [0031] - paragraph [0049]; figures 2,4 *; | [AD]DE19607868 (VOITH SULZER PAPIERMASCH GMBH [DE]) [AD] 1,17,19 * the whole document *; | [AD]DE19919051 (VOITH SULZER PAPIERTECH PATENT [DE]) [AD] 1,20,21,24,25 * the whole document * |