EP1684168 - Synchronizing registers [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.03.2010 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.03.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 28.04.2010 [2010/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HEWLETT-PACKARD DEVELOPMENT COMPANY, L.P. 20555 S.H. 249 Houston, TX 77070 / US | [2009/21] |
Former [2006/30] | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Development Company, L.P. 20555 S.H. 249 Houston, TX 77070 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Campbell, Robert G. 10955 Tantau Ave. CA 95014-0770, Cupertino / US | [2006/32] |
Former [2006/30] | 01 /
Campbell, Robert G. 10955 Tantau Ave. 95014-0770, Cupertino / US | Representative(s) | Lawman, Matthew John Mitchell, et al EIP Fairfax House 15 Fulwood Place London, WC1V 6HU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2006/52] | Lawman, Matthew John Mitchell, et al EIP Fairfax House 15 Fulwood Place London, WC1V 6HU / GB | ||
Former [2006/38] | Lawman, Matthew John Mitchell, et al Electronic Intellectual Property Fairfax House 15 Fulwood Place London, WC1V 6HU / GB | ||
Former [2006/30] | Durville, Guillaume Hewlett Packard Espanola, S.L. Barcelona Site Avda. Graells 501 08174 Sant Cugat del Valles / ES | Application number, filing date | 06100390.1 | 16.01.2006 | [2006/30] | Priority number, date | US20050040756 | 21.01.2005 Original published format: US 40756 | [2006/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1684168 | Date: | 26.07.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/30] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1684168 | Date: | 23.08.2006 | [2006/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1684168 | Date: | 20.05.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.07.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G06F1/14, G06F9/38 | [2006/34] | CPC: |
G06F9/3869 (EP,US);
G06F1/14 (EP,US);
G06F9/3885 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2006/30] | G06F9/38 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR [2007/18] |
Former [2006/30] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Register Synchronisierung | [2006/37] | English: | Synchronizing registers | [2006/30] | French: | Synchronisation de registres | [2006/37] |
Former [2006/30] | Synchronisierungsregister | ||
Former [2006/30] | Registres de synchronisation | Examination procedure | 23.02.2007 | Examination requested [2007/15] | 09.03.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.06.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M03) | 03.10.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.12.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.04.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 03.04.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.02.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US5001730 (FRANASZEK PETER A [US], et al) [X] 1-4 * column 1, line 64 - column 2, line 19 * * abstract * * column 3, line 37 - line 65 * [A] 5-10; | [XA]US6502141 (LEIGH RAWSON FREEMAN III [US]) [X] 1-4 * abstract * * figures 1-4 * * column 3, line 50 - line 64 * * column 5, line 25 - column 6, line 46 * [A] 5-10; | [A]US6389547 (JAMES DAVID VERNON [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * figure 10 * * abstract *; | [A]WO0122202 (COMUNIQ ASA [NO], et al) [A] 1-10 * the whole document * |