Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
26.03.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 28.04.2010 [2010/17] |
17.04.2009 | (Expected) grant | published on 20.05.2009 [2009/21] |
15.04.2009 | New entry: Payment of fee for grant | |
15.04.2009 | New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing | |
10.02.2009 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
27.11.2008 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | |
14.11.2008 | New entry: Reply to examination report | |
27.06.2008 | First examination report | |
21.06.2008 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | |
01.02.2008 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
30.03.2007 | Definitive list of designations | published on 02.05.2007 [2007/18] |
16.03.2007 | Amendment by applicant | |
09.03.2007 | Request for examination filed | published on 11.04.2007 [2007/15] |
24.11.2006 | Change - representative | published on 27.12.2006 [2006/52] |
18.08.2006 | Change - representative | published on 20.09.2006 [2006/38] |
11.08.2006 | Change - German title | published on 13.09.2006 [2006/37] |
21.07.2006 | Publication of search report | published on 23.08.2006 [2006/34] |
21.07.2006 | Change - classification | published on 23.08.2006 [2006/34] |
21.07.2006 | Change - classification | published on 23.08.2006 [2006/34] |
07.07.2006 | Change - inventor | published on 09.08.2006 [2006/32] |
23.06.2006 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 26.07.2006 [2006/30] |