Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7437587 | Global Dossier | 14.10.2008 | B2 | US2006168465 | 27.07.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US4075605 | 21.01.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2006202285 | Global Dossier | 03.08.2006 | A | Priority number | Date | US4075605 | 21.01.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1684168 | Global Dossier | 20.05.2009 | B1 | EP1684168 | 23.08.2006 | A3 | EP1684168 | 26.07.2006 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US4075605 | 21.01.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN100555268C | 28.10.2009 | C | CN1831805 | 13.09.2006 | A | Priority number | Date | US4075605 | 21.01.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE602006006877D1 | 02.07.2009 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US4075605 | 21.01.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | TW200634482 | 01.10.2006 | A | Priority number | Date | US4075605 | 21.01.2005 |