EP1683921 - Particularly shaped hook for fixing sinks, washbasins or the like to base planes [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.01.2009 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.09.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 26.10.2011 [2011/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Marcolini, Giuseppe S.n.c., di Marcolini Franco, Roberto & C. Via Repubblica, 137 25068 Sarezzo (Brescia) / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2006/30] | For all designated states Marcolini, Giuseppe S.n.c., di Marcolini Franco, Roberto & C. Via Repubblica, 137 25068 Sarezzo (Brescia) / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Marcolini, Roberto Via Repubblica, 131 25068 Sarezzo (BS) / IT | [2006/30] | Representative(s) | Fisauli, Beatrice A. M., et al Con Lor SPA Via A. Sciesa, 9 37122 Verona / IT | [2006/30] | Application number, filing date | 06100477.6 | 17.01.2006 | [2006/30] | Priority number, date | IT2005VR00013 | 25.01.2005 Original published format: IT VR20050013 | [2006/30] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1683921 | Date: | 26.07.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/30] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1683921 | Date: | 02.08.2006 | [2006/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1683921 | Date: | 19.03.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.07.2006 | Classification | IPC: | E03C1/33 | [2006/30] | CPC: |
E03C1/33 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/30] | Title | German: | Speziell geformte Haken zur Befestigung von Waschbecken oder dergleichen an Basisplatten | [2006/30] | English: | Particularly shaped hook for fixing sinks, washbasins or the like to base planes | [2006/30] | French: | Crochet de forme particulière pour fixer un lavabo ou similaire à un plan de base | [2007/37] |
Former [2006/30] | Crochet en forme particulière pour attacher un lavabo ou similaire à un plan de base | Examination procedure | 22.11.2006 | Examination requested [2007/01] | 11.01.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.07.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.10.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.02.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 04.02.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.12.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 19.03.2008 | BE | 19.03.2008 | CY | 19.03.2008 | CZ | 19.03.2008 | DK | 19.03.2008 | EE | 19.03.2008 | FI | 19.03.2008 | LT | 19.03.2008 | LV | 19.03.2008 | NL | 19.03.2008 | PL | 19.03.2008 | RO | 19.03.2008 | SK | 19.03.2008 | TR | 19.03.2008 | BG | 19.06.2008 | SE | 19.06.2008 | ES | 30.06.2008 | IS | 19.07.2008 | HU | 20.09.2008 | [2011/43] |
Former [2011/32] | AT | 19.03.2008 | |
BE | 19.03.2008 | ||
CY | 19.03.2008 | ||
CZ | 19.03.2008 | ||
DK | 19.03.2008 | ||
EE | 19.03.2008 | ||
FI | 19.03.2008 | ||
LT | 19.03.2008 | ||
LV | 19.03.2008 | ||
NL | 19.03.2008 | ||
PL | 19.03.2008 | ||
RO | 19.03.2008 | ||
SK | 19.03.2008 | ||
BG | 19.06.2008 | ||
SE | 19.06.2008 | ||
ES | 30.06.2008 | ||
IS | 19.07.2008 | ||
HU | 20.09.2008 | ||
Former [2010/02] | AT | 19.03.2008 | |
BE | 19.03.2008 | ||
CY | 19.03.2008 | ||
CZ | 19.03.2008 | ||
DK | 19.03.2008 | ||
EE | 19.03.2008 | ||
FI | 19.03.2008 | ||
LT | 19.03.2008 | ||
LV | 19.03.2008 | ||
NL | 19.03.2008 | ||
PL | 19.03.2008 | ||
RO | 19.03.2008 | ||
SK | 19.03.2008 | ||
BG | 19.06.2008 | ||
SE | 19.06.2008 | ||
ES | 30.06.2008 | ||
IS | 19.07.2008 | ||
Former [2009/28] | AT | 19.03.2008 | |
BE | 19.03.2008 | ||
CZ | 19.03.2008 | ||
DK | 19.03.2008 | ||
EE | 19.03.2008 | ||
FI | 19.03.2008 | ||
LT | 19.03.2008 | ||
LV | 19.03.2008 | ||
NL | 19.03.2008 | ||
PL | 19.03.2008 | ||
RO | 19.03.2008 | ||
SK | 19.03.2008 | ||
BG | 19.06.2008 | ||
SE | 19.06.2008 | ||
ES | 30.06.2008 | ||
IS | 19.07.2008 | ||
Former [2009/09] | AT | 19.03.2008 | |
BE | 19.03.2008 | ||
CZ | 19.03.2008 | ||
DK | 19.03.2008 | ||
FI | 19.03.2008 | ||
LT | 19.03.2008 | ||
LV | 19.03.2008 | ||
NL | 19.03.2008 | ||
PL | 19.03.2008 | ||
RO | 19.03.2008 | ||
SK | 19.03.2008 | ||
SE | 19.06.2008 | ||
ES | 30.06.2008 | ||
IS | 19.07.2008 | ||
Former [2009/05] | AT | 19.03.2008 | |
BE | 19.03.2008 | ||
CZ | 19.03.2008 | ||
FI | 19.03.2008 | ||
LT | 19.03.2008 | ||
LV | 19.03.2008 | ||
NL | 19.03.2008 | ||
PL | 19.03.2008 | ||
RO | 19.03.2008 | ||
SK | 19.03.2008 | ||
SE | 19.06.2008 | ||
ES | 30.06.2008 | ||
IS | 19.07.2008 | ||
Former [2009/01] | AT | 19.03.2008 | |
BE | 19.03.2008 | ||
CZ | 19.03.2008 | ||
FI | 19.03.2008 | ||
LT | 19.03.2008 | ||
LV | 19.03.2008 | ||
NL | 19.03.2008 | ||
PL | 19.03.2008 | ||
RO | 19.03.2008 | ||
SK | 19.03.2008 | ||
SE | 19.06.2008 | ||
ES | 30.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/50] | AT | 19.03.2008 | |
BE | 19.03.2008 | ||
CZ | 19.03.2008 | ||
FI | 19.03.2008 | ||
LT | 19.03.2008 | ||
LV | 19.03.2008 | ||
PL | 19.03.2008 | ||
RO | 19.03.2008 | ||
SK | 19.03.2008 | ||
SE | 19.06.2008 | ||
ES | 30.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/46] | AT | 19.03.2008 | |
BE | 19.03.2008 | ||
FI | 19.03.2008 | ||
LT | 19.03.2008 | ||
LV | 19.03.2008 | ||
PL | 19.03.2008 | ||
SE | 19.06.2008 | ||
ES | 30.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/44] | AT | 19.03.2008 | |
BE | 19.03.2008 | ||
FI | 19.03.2008 | ||
LT | 19.03.2008 | ||
LV | 19.03.2008 | ||
PL | 19.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/43] | AT | 19.03.2008 | |
BE | 19.03.2008 | ||
FI | 19.03.2008 | ||
LT | 19.03.2008 | ||
PL | 19.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/39] | AT | 19.03.2008 | |
FI | 19.03.2008 | ||
LT | 19.03.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4589170 (PONTING MICHAEL A F [GB]) [A] 1-12 * abstract *; | [A]US5664265 (GOETTER HANS [DE], et al) [A] 1-12 * abstract * * figure 3 *; | [A]FR2748766 (MARCOLINI GIUSEPPE & C SNC [IT]) [A] 1-12 * abstract ** figure - *; | [X]EP0931882 (BLANCO GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [X] 1-4,6,12 * abstract * * column 4, paragraph 12 - column 6, paragraph 20; figures 1-4 *; | [X]US2003154546 (ROMO MARK A [US]) [X] 1-4,8,12 * abstract * * page 2, paragraph 26 - paragraph 33 * * figures 1-7 * |