Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2007082837 | Global Dossier | 26.07.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP06100479 | 17.01.2006 | EP06118010 | 27.07.2006 | EP06118001 | 27.07.2006 | EP06118004 | 27.07.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8460761 | Global Dossier | 11.06.2013 | B2 | US2010190021 | 29.07.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP06100479 | 17.01.2006 | EP06118010 | 27.07.2006 | EP06118001 | 27.07.2006 | WO2007EP50272 | 12.01.2007 | EP06118004 | 27.07.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5328370B | Global Dossier | 30.10.2013 | B2 | JP2009523628 | 25.06.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | EP06100479 | 17.01.2006 | EP06118010 | 27.07.2006 | EP06118001 | 27.07.2006 | WO2007EP50272 | 12.01.2007 | EP06118004 | 27.07.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1979139 | Global Dossier | 15.10.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP06100479 | 17.01.2006 | EP06118010 | 27.07.2006 | EP07703814 | 12.01.2007 | EP06118001 | 27.07.2006 | WO2007EP50272 | 12.01.2007 | EP06118004 | 27.07.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2007206994B | Global Dossier | 10.02.2011 | B2 | AU2007206994 | 26.07.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP06100479 | 17.01.2006 | EP06118010 | 27.07.2006 | EP06118001 | 27.07.2006 | WO2007EP50272 | 12.01.2007 | EP06118004 | 27.07.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BRPI0706437 | 29.03.2011 | A2 | Priority number | Date | EP06100479 | 17.01.2006 | EP06118010 | 27.07.2006 | EP06118001 | 27.07.2006 | WO2007EP50272 | 12.01.2007 | EP06118004 | 27.07.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2631869 | 18.03.2014 | C | CA2631869 | 26.07.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP06100479 | 17.01.2006 | EP06118010 | 27.07.2006 | EP06118001 | 27.07.2006 | WO2007EP50272 | 12.01.2007 | EP06118004 | 27.07.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101370626B | 01.05.2013 | B | CN101370626 | 18.02.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | EP06100479 | 17.01.2006 | EP06118010 | 27.07.2006 | EP06118001 | 27.07.2006 | WO2007EP50272 | 12.01.2007 | EP06118004 | 27.07.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MY146656 | 14.09.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | EP06100479 | 17.01.2006 | EP06118010 | 27.07.2006 | EP06118001 | 27.07.2006 | EP06118004 | 27.07.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | NO20082648L | 12.08.2008 | L | Priority number | Date | EP06100479 | 17.01.2006 | EP06118010 | 27.07.2006 | EP06118001 | 27.07.2006 | WO2007EP50272 | 12.01.2007 | EP06118004 | 27.07.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | NZ569380 | 30.07.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | EP06100479 | 17.01.2006 | EP06118010 | 27.07.2006 | EP06118001 | 27.07.2006 | WO2007EP50272 | 12.01.2007 | EP06118004 | 27.07.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | RU2437755 | 27.12.2011 | C2 | RU2008133385 | 27.02.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | EP06100479 | 17.01.2006 | EP06118010 | 27.07.2006 | EP06118001 | 27.07.2006 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1808278 | Global Dossier | 18.07.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP06100479 | 17.01.2006 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | UA95792 | 12.09.2011 | C2 | Priority number | Date | EP06100479 | 17.01.2006 |