EP1808278 - Process for Reducing the Formaldehyde Emission of Wood Materials [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.06.2008 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.06.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.07.2008 [2008/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF SE Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67056 Ludwigshafen am Rhein / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/10] | For all designated states BASF SE 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | ||
Former [2007/29] | For all designated states BASF Aktiengesellschaft 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rüba, Eva, Dr. U4, 18 68161 Mannheim / DE | 02 /
Weinkötz, Stephan, Dr. Hermann-Ehlers-Strasse 6 67434 Neustadt / DE | 03 /
Schmidt, Michael Rheinhäuser Strasse 86c 67346 Speyer / DE | 04 /
Finkenauer, Michael An der Brennerei 11 67593 Westhofen / DE | 05 /
Beil, Christian Goldbergstrasse 11a 67551 Worms / DE | [2007/29] | Application number, filing date | 06100479.2 | 17.01.2006 | [2007/29] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1808278 | Date: | 18.07.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.07.2006 | Classification | IPC: | B27K3/15, B27K3/34, B27K3/50 | [2007/29] | CPC: |
B27N1/003 (EP);
B27K3/15 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2008/13] |
Former [2007/29] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Reduktion der Formaldehydemission bei Holzwerkstoffen | [2007/29] | English: | Process for Reducing the Formaldehyde Emission of Wood Materials | [2007/29] | French: | Procédé pour la réduction de l'émission de formaldéhyde des matériaux en bois | [2007/29] | Examination procedure | 17.01.2006 | Examination requested [2007/29] | 18.01.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/29] | 03.03.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2008/29] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2008 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XD]JP2002273145 ; | [X]DE3536417 (DESOWAG BAYER HOLZSCHUTZ GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-11 * page 5, lines 49-62 *; | [A]JPH05245807 | [XD] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20030114), vol. 2003, no. 01, & JP2002273145 A 20020924 (KOIZUMI MARIKO) [XD] 1-11 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19931222), vol. 017, no. 705, Database accession no. (M - 1534), & JP05245807 A 19930924 (DAIKEN TRADE & IND CO LTD) [A] 1-11 * abstract * | by applicant | EP0006486 | WO2004085125 | JP2002273145 | - M. DUNKY; P. NIEMZ, HOLZWERKSTOFFE UND LEIME, SPRINGER VERLAG, (2002), pages 251 - 302 | - G. MYERS, FOREST PRODUCTS JOURNAL, (1986), vol. 36, no. 6, pages 41 - 51 | - E. ROFFAEL; H. MIERTZSCH, ADHÄSION, (1990), vol. 4, pages 13 - 19 | - E. ROFFAEL; H. MIERTZSCH, ADHÄSION, (1999), vol. 4, pages 13 - 19 |