EP1810838 - Device for assembling a plurality of sheets [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.06.2008 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.05.2009 | Change - representative | published on 01.07.2009 [2009/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cadara N.V. Huysmanslaan 94 1651 Lot-Beersel / BE | [2007/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Piot, Marc c/o CADARA N.V. Huysmanslaan, 94 1651 Lot-Beersel / BE | [2007/30] | Representative(s) | Quintelier, Claude, et al Gevers Intellectual Property House Holidaystraat 5 1831 Diegem / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/27] | Quintelier, Claude, et al Gevers & Vander Haeghen Intellectual Property House Holidaystraat 5 Brussels Airport Business Park 1831 Diegem / BE | ||
Former [2007/30] | Quintelier, Claude, et al Gevers & Vander Haeghen Holidaystraat 5 1831 Diegem / BE | Application number, filing date | 06100736.5 | 23.01.2006 | [2007/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1810838 | Date: | 25.07.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.07.2006 | Classification | IPC: | B42B5/08 | [2007/30] | CPC: |
B42B5/08 (EP);
B42F3/003 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | [2008/14] |
Former [2007/30] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Binden mehrer Bögen | [2007/30] | English: | Device for assembling a plurality of sheets | [2007/30] | French: | Dispositif d'assemblage d'une pluralité de feuilles | [2007/30] | Examination procedure | 26.01.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/30] | 05.03.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2008/30] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2008 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0895871 (PRIMA SRL [IT]) [X] 1-7 * the whole document *; | [X]GB667716 (OLYMPIC VARNISH COMPANY LTD) [X] 1-7 * the whole document * |