Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP1752547
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
28.11.2014 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
published on 31.12.2014 [2015/01] |
26.08.2014 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
05.03.2014 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
05.06.2013 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
08.02.2013 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
28.01.2013 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
25.01.2013 |
First examination report |
|
09.02.2012 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
08.02.2011 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
06.02.2010 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
10.02.2009 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
07.02.2008 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
24.10.2007 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
24.10.2007 |
Deletion: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
05.10.2007 |
First examination report |
|
29.09.2007 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
14.09.2007 |
Definitive list of designations |
published on 17.10.2007 [2007/42] |
17.08.2007 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 19.09.2007 [2007/38] |
12.01.2007 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 14.02.2007 [2007/07] |