EP1752547 - Crack-propagation preventing structure, method for preventing crack propagation, crack propagation preventing apparatus, and method for producing skin panel for aircraft [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.11.2014 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.11.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 31.12.2014 [2015/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MITSUBISHI HEAVY INDUSTRIES, LTD. 16-5, Konan 2-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8215 / JP | [2007/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NISHIMURA, Toshihiko, MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND. LTD NAGOYA Aerospace Systems Works, 10,Oye-cho Minato-ku, Nagoya, 455-8515, Aichi-ken / JP | [2007/07] | Representative(s) | Henkel & Partner mbB Patentanwaltskanzlei, Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Maximiliansplatz 21 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/07] | Henkel, Feiler & Hänzel Patentanwälte Maximiliansplatz 21 80333 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06100878.5 | 26.01.2006 | [2007/07] | Priority number, date | JP20050230586 | 09.08.2005 Original published format: JP 2005230586 | [2007/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1752547 | Date: | 14.02.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.11.2006 | Classification | IPC: | C21D7/00, B23P9/00, B24B39/00, C21D7/04, B23P6/04 | [2007/07] | CPC: |
B23P6/04 (EP,US);
B23P9/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB [2007/42] |
Former [2007/07] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Struktur zum Verhindern der Rissausbreitung, Verfahren zur Verhinderung der Rissausbreitung, Vorrichtung zum Verhindern der Rissausbreitung, und Verfahren zur Herstellung eines Flugzeugaussenbleches | [2007/07] | English: | Crack-propagation preventing structure, method for preventing crack propagation, crack propagation preventing apparatus, and method for producing skin panel for aircraft | [2007/07] | French: | Structure pour empêcher la propagation des fissures, procédé pour empêcher la propagation des fissures, dispositif pour empêcher la propagation des fissures, et procédé de fabrication d'un panneau de revêtement d'avion. | [2007/07] | Examination procedure | 06.08.2007 | Examination requested [2007/38] | 01.10.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.01.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.06.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.08.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/01] | 27.08.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2015/01] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 28.01.2013 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2014 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]SU1349945 ; | [X]RU2047454 ; | DD282575 [ ] (GOSNII GA [SU]) [ ] * abstract *; | [X]US5771729 (BAILEY PETER G [US], et al) [X] 1-5,8 * column 1, line 49 - line 58 * * column 2, line 29 - line 65 * * column 3, line 3 - line 54 * * figure 1; claims 1,12 *; | [DX]US6389865 (EASTERBROOK ERIC T [US]) [DX] 1,2,4,5,9 * column 1, line 29 - line 55 * * column 2, line 1 - line 28 * * column 7, line 14 - column 8, line 24 * * figures 7-13 *; | [X]US6622570 (PREVEY III PAUL S [US]) [X] 1,3-5,8,9 * column 3, line 38 - column 4, line 49 * * column 7, line 54 - column 8, line 20 * * column 9, line 17 - line 27 ** figures 1,4-7,11,14 *; | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1988, no. 22, Database accession no. 1988-153797, XP002402693 & SU1349945 A 19871107 (CIVIL AVIATION RES INST) [X] 1,2,4-7,9 * abstract * | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1996, no. 28, Database accession no. 1996-275724, XP002402682 & RU2047454 C1 19951110 (AEROHYDRODYNAMICS INST) [X] 1,2,4-7,9 * abstract * | Examination | US2001052254 | by applicant | US5826453 | US6389865 | US2002148270 | JP2005230586 |