EP1693649 - Mixed integer linear programming trajectory generation for autonomous nap-of-the-earth flight in a threat environment [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.12.2012 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.01.2013 [2013/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Northrop Grumman Systems Corporation 1840 Century Park East Los Angeles, CA 90067-2199 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2011/12] | For all designated states Northrop Grumman Systems Corporation 1840 Century Park East Los Angeles, CA 90067-2199 / US | ||
Former [2006/34] | For all designated states Northorp Grumman Corporation 1840 Century Park East Los Angeles, CA 90067 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MA, Cedric Sek-Kong 4810 Via Colina 90042, LOS ANGELES / US | 02 /
MILLER, Robert Henry 327 North Vulcan 92024, ENCINITAS / US | [2006/34] | Representative(s) | Franzolin, Luigi, et al Studio Torta S.p.A. Via Viotti, 9 10121 Torino / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2006/34] | Franzolin, Luigi, et al STUDIO TORTA S.r.l., Via Viotti, 9 10121 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 06101085.6 | 31.01.2006 | [2006/34] | Priority number, date | US20050060347P | 17.02.2005 Original published format: US 60347 P | [2006/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1693649 | Date: | 23.08.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/34] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1693649 | Date: | 06.06.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.05.2012 | Classification | IPC: | G01C23/00, G05D1/04, G01C21/20 | [2012/23] | CPC: |
G01C21/20 (EP);
G01S13/935 (US);
G01C23/00 (US);
G05D1/101 (US)
|
Former IPC [2006/34] | G01C23/00, G05D1/04 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/34] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MILP (Mixed Integer Linear Programming)-Generierung einer Flugbahn für autonomen Tiefstflug in einer Bedrohungsumgebung | [2006/34] | English: | Mixed integer linear programming trajectory generation for autonomous nap-of-the-earth flight in a threat environment | [2006/34] | French: | Génération de trajectoires de programmation linéaire partiellement en nombres entiers pour vol tactique autonome dans un environnement hostile | [2006/34] | Examination procedure | 31.01.2006 | Examination requested [2006/34] | 01.08.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/05] | 10.09.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2013/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2008 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   18.03.2008 | 31.01.2012 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD] - TOM SCHOUWENAARS ET AL, "Hybrid Architecture for Full-Envelope Autonomous Rotorcraft Guidance", AMERICAN HELICOPTER SOCIETY 59TH ANNUAL FORUM,, (20030506), pages 1 - 22, XP007920561 [AD] 1,12 * the whole document * | [AD] - BELLINGHAM J ET AL, "Receding horizon control of autonomous aerial vehicles", PROCEEDINGS OF THE 2002 AMERICAN CONTROL CONFERENCE. ACC. ANCHORAGE, AL, MAY 8 - 10, 2002; [AMERICAN CONTROL CONFERENCE], NEW YORK, NY : IEEE, US, (20020508), vol. 5, doi:10.1109/ACC.2002.1024509, ISBN 978-0-7803-7298-6, pages 3741 - 3746, XP010596959 [AD] 1,12 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ACC.2002.1024509 | [XP] - MA C S ET AL, "Mixed Integer Linear Programming Trajectory Generation for Autonomous Nap-of-the-Earth Flight in a Threat Environment", AEROSPACE CONFERENCE, 2005 IEEE, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20050305), doi:10.1109/AERO.2005.1559599, ISBN 978-0-7803-8870-3, pages 1 - 9, XP010864539 [XP] 1-22 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/AERO.2005.1559599 |