Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
28.12.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.01.2013 [2013/05] |
10.09.2012 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | |
04.05.2012 | Publication of search report | published on 06.06.2012 [2012/23] |
04.05.2012 | Change - classification | published on 06.06.2012 [2012/23] |
04.05.2012 | Change - classification | published on 06.06.2012 [2012/23] |
01.03.2012 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | |
18.02.2011 | Change - applicant | published on 23.03.2011 [2011/12] |
28.01.2011 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
27.01.2010 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
27.01.2009 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
28.03.2008 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: payment of fee | |
28.03.2008 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
01.03.2008 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | |
21.07.2006 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 23.08.2006 [2006/34] |
21.07.2006 | Request for examination filed | published on 23.08.2006 [2006/34] |