Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7248952 | Global Dossier | 24.07.2007 | B2 | US2006184294 | 17.08.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US6034705 | 17.02.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4852688B | Global Dossier | 11.01.2012 | B2 | JP2006228227 | 31.08.2006 | A | Priority number | Date | US6034705 | 17.02.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1693649 | Global Dossier | 06.06.2012 | A3 | EP1693649 | 23.08.2006 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US6034705 | 17.02.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | IL173327 | 30.11.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | US6034705 | 17.02.2005 |