EP1696352 - Platform for data services across disparate application frameworks [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 06.10.2017 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.10.2017 | Refusal of application | published on 08.11.2017 [2017/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Microsoft Technology Licensing, LLC One Microsoft Way Redmond, WA 98052 / US | [2015/12] |
Former [2006/35] | For all designated states MICROSOFT CORPORATION One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nori, Anil K. c/o Microsoft Corporation, One Microsoft Way Redmond, WA 98052 / US | 02 /
Whitten, Arthur T. c/o Microsoft Corporation, One Microsoft Way Redmond, WA 98052 / US | 03 /
Woodford, Dale c/o Microsoft Corporation One Microsoft Way Redmond, WA 98052 / US | 04 /
Blakeley, Jose A. c/o Microsoft Corporation One Microsoft Way Redmond, WA 98052 / US | 05 /
Celis, Pedro c/o Microsoft Corporation One Microsoft Way Redmond, WA 98052 / US | 06 /
Seshadri, Praveen c/o Microsoft Corporation One Microsoft Way Redmond, WA 98052 / US | 07 /
Agarwal, Sameet H. c/o Microsoft Corporation One Microsoft Way Redmond, WA 98052 / US | 08 /
Terek, Soner c/o Microsoft Corporation One Microsoft Way Redmond, WA 98052 / US | [2006/35] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/23] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/21] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | ||
Former [2006/35] | Zimmer, Franz-Josef Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06101151.6 | 01.02.2006 | [2006/35] | Priority number, date | US20050657556P | 28.02.2005 Original published format: US 657556 P | US20050171905 | 30.06.2005 Original published format: US 171905 | [2006/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1696352 | Date: | 30.08.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/35] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1696352 | Date: | 09.05.2007 | [2007/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.04.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/30 | [2006/35] | CPC: |
G06F16/289 (EP,US);
B60N3/023 (KR);
G06F16/258 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/35] | Title | German: | Plattform für Datendienste in ungleichen Anwendungsrahmen | [2006/35] | English: | Platform for data services across disparate application frameworks | [2006/35] | French: | Plate-forme pour services de données sur des cadres d'applications disparates | [2006/35] | Examination procedure | 27.02.2007 | Examination requested [2007/15] | 30.10.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.03.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.08.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.02.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.02.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.04.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.05.2017 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2017/45] | 10.05.2017 | Date of oral proceedings | 16.06.2017 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 19.06.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2017/45] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 30.10.2007 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 07.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 07.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 13.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 10.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 10.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US6128624 (PAPIERNIAK KAREN A [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * column 2, line 55 - column 6, line 40 * * column 7, line 33 - column 25, line 27 *; | [X] - P. A. MITTAL M. KUMAR M. K. MOHANIA M. NAIR N. BATRA P. ROY A. SARONWALA L. YAGNIK, "A framework for eGovernance solutions", IBM J. RES. & DEV, vol. 48, no. 5/6, (200409), pages 717 - 733, URL: http://www.research.ibm.com/journal/rd/485/mittal.pdf, (20070327), XP002427146 [X] 1-20 * the whole document * | [A] - L. DAVIS, R. GAMBLE, "Understanding Services for Integration Management", DEPARTMENT OF MATHEMATICAL AND COMPUTER SCIENCES, Tulsa, OK 74104 USA, (2004), pages 84 - 93, URL: http://www.springerlink.com/content/ec2jecgdb77jplug/fulltext.pdf, (20070322), XP002427147 [A] 1-20 * the whole document * | [A] - DISCOVERING AND USING WEB SERVICES IN M-COMMERCE, "Discovering and Using Web Services in M-Commerce", LECTURE NOTES IN COMPUTER SCIENCE, 136-151, ISSN 1611-3349, (20050218), pages 136 - 151, URL: http://www.springerlink.com/content/1d8ylqena0gdb1rp/fulltext.pdf, (20070322), XP002427148 [A] 1-20 * the whole document * |