EP1692965 - Extensible table [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.07.2008 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.09.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, TR | published on 13.10.2010 [2010/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hutmacher, Markus Bachstrasse 108 5000 Aarau / CH | [2007/37] |
Former [2006/34] | For all designated states Hufmacher, Markus Bachstrasse 108 5000 Aarau / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2006/34] | Representative(s) | BOVARD AG Patent- und Markenanwälte Optingenstrasse 16 3013 Bern / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2006/34] | BOVARD AG Optingenstrasse 16 3000 Bern 25 / CH | Application number, filing date | 06101309.0 | 06.02.2006 | [2006/34] | Priority number, date | CH20050000290 | 18.02.2005 Original published format: CH 2902005 | [2006/34] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1692965 | Date: | 23.08.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1692965 | Date: | 12.09.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.07.2006 | Classification | IPC: | A47B1/08 | [2006/34] | CPC: |
A47B1/08 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/34] | Title | German: | Ausziehtisch | [2006/34] | English: | Extensible table | [2006/34] | French: | Table extensible | [2006/34] | Examination procedure | 12.12.2006 | Examination requested [2007/04] | 13.04.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.07.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 27.07.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.06.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/34] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 12.09.2007 | CZ | 12.09.2007 | DK | 12.09.2007 | EE | 12.09.2007 | FI | 12.09.2007 | LT | 12.09.2007 | LV | 12.09.2007 | NL | 12.09.2007 | PL | 12.09.2007 | RO | 12.09.2007 | SI | 12.09.2007 | SK | 12.09.2007 | TR | 12.09.2007 | BG | 12.12.2007 | SE | 12.12.2007 | GR | 13.12.2007 | ES | 23.12.2007 | IS | 12.01.2008 | LU | 06.02.2008 | PT | 12.02.2008 | MC | 28.02.2008 | HU | 13.03.2008 | [2010/41] |
Former [2010/33] | CY | 12.09.2007 | |
CZ | 12.09.2007 | ||
DK | 12.09.2007 | ||
EE | 12.09.2007 | ||
FI | 12.09.2007 | ||
LT | 12.09.2007 | ||
LV | 12.09.2007 | ||
NL | 12.09.2007 | ||
PL | 12.09.2007 | ||
RO | 12.09.2007 | ||
SI | 12.09.2007 | ||
SK | 12.09.2007 | ||
BG | 12.12.2007 | ||
SE | 12.12.2007 | ||
GR | 13.12.2007 | ||
ES | 23.12.2007 | ||
IS | 12.01.2008 | ||
LU | 06.02.2008 | ||
PT | 12.02.2008 | ||
MC | 28.02.2008 | ||
Former [2010/02] | CY | 12.09.2007 | |
CZ | 12.09.2007 | ||
DK | 12.09.2007 | ||
EE | 12.09.2007 | ||
FI | 12.09.2007 | ||
LT | 12.09.2007 | ||
LV | 12.09.2007 | ||
NL | 12.09.2007 | ||
PL | 12.09.2007 | ||
RO | 12.09.2007 | ||
SI | 12.09.2007 | ||
SK | 12.09.2007 | ||
BG | 12.12.2007 | ||
SE | 12.12.2007 | ||
GR | 13.12.2007 | ||
ES | 23.12.2007 | ||
IS | 12.01.2008 | ||
PT | 12.02.2008 | ||
MC | 28.02.2008 | ||
Former [2009/29] | CZ | 12.09.2007 | |
DK | 12.09.2007 | ||
EE | 12.09.2007 | ||
FI | 12.09.2007 | ||
LT | 12.09.2007 | ||
LV | 12.09.2007 | ||
NL | 12.09.2007 | ||
PL | 12.09.2007 | ||
RO | 12.09.2007 | ||
SI | 12.09.2007 | ||
SK | 12.09.2007 | ||
SE | 12.12.2007 | ||
GR | 13.12.2007 | ||
ES | 23.12.2007 | ||
IS | 12.01.2008 | ||
PT | 12.02.2008 | ||
MC | 28.02.2008 | ||
Former [2009/11] | CZ | 12.09.2007 | |
DK | 12.09.2007 | ||
EE | 12.09.2007 | ||
FI | 12.09.2007 | ||
LT | 12.09.2007 | ||
LV | 12.09.2007 | ||
NL | 12.09.2007 | ||
PL | 12.09.2007 | ||
RO | 12.09.2007 | ||
SK | 12.09.2007 | ||
SE | 12.12.2007 | ||
GR | 13.12.2007 | ||
ES | 23.12.2007 | ||
IS | 12.01.2008 | ||
PT | 12.02.2008 | ||
MC | 28.02.2008 | ||
Former [2008/46] | CZ | 12.09.2007 | |
DK | 12.09.2007 | ||
FI | 12.09.2007 | ||
LT | 12.09.2007 | ||
LV | 12.09.2007 | ||
NL | 12.09.2007 | ||
PL | 12.09.2007 | ||
RO | 12.09.2007 | ||
SK | 12.09.2007 | ||
SE | 12.12.2007 | ||
GR | 13.12.2007 | ||
ES | 23.12.2007 | ||
IS | 12.01.2008 | ||
PT | 12.02.2008 | ||
MC | 28.02.2008 | ||
Former [2008/35] | CZ | 12.09.2007 | |
DK | 12.09.2007 | ||
FI | 12.09.2007 | ||
LT | 12.09.2007 | ||
LV | 12.09.2007 | ||
NL | 12.09.2007 | ||
PL | 12.09.2007 | ||
RO | 12.09.2007 | ||
SK | 12.09.2007 | ||
SE | 12.12.2007 | ||
GR | 13.12.2007 | ||
ES | 23.12.2007 | ||
IS | 12.01.2008 | ||
PT | 12.02.2008 | ||
Former [2008/28] | CZ | 12.09.2007 | |
FI | 12.09.2007 | ||
LT | 12.09.2007 | ||
LV | 12.09.2007 | ||
NL | 12.09.2007 | ||
PL | 12.09.2007 | ||
RO | 12.09.2007 | ||
SK | 12.09.2007 | ||
SE | 12.12.2007 | ||
GR | 13.12.2007 | ||
ES | 23.12.2007 | ||
IS | 12.01.2008 | ||
PT | 12.02.2008 | ||
Former [2008/24] | CZ | 12.09.2007 | |
FI | 12.09.2007 | ||
LT | 12.09.2007 | ||
LV | 12.09.2007 | ||
NL | 12.09.2007 | ||
PL | 12.09.2007 | ||
SK | 12.09.2007 | ||
GR | 13.12.2007 | ||
ES | 23.12.2007 | ||
IS | 12.01.2008 | ||
PT | 12.02.2008 | ||
Former [2008/22] | FI | 12.09.2007 | |
LT | 12.09.2007 | ||
LV | 12.09.2007 | ||
PL | 12.09.2007 | ||
GR | 13.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/17] | FI | 12.09.2007 | |
LT | 12.09.2007 | ||
LV | 12.09.2007 | ||
PL | 12.09.2007 | ||
Former [2008/14] | FI | 12.09.2007 | |
LT | 12.09.2007 | ||
PL | 12.09.2007 | ||
Former [2008/12] | FI | 12.09.2007 | |
LT | 12.09.2007 | ||
Former [2008/07] | LT | 12.09.2007 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE7443304U (FORMSTUDIO DRAENERT P) [A] 1-8 * the whole document *; | [A]DE10050136 (LIEBER BERT [DE]) [A] 1-8* the whole document * |