EP1696491 - Non volatile memory and fabrication method thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.02.2010 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.02.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.03.2010 [2010/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Infineon Technologies AG St.-Martin-Strasse 53 81669 München / DE | [2008/30] |
Former [2006/35] | For all designated states Infineon Technologies AG St. Martin-Strasse 53 81669 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Willer, Josef Friedrich-Fröbel-Str. 62 85521 Riemerling / DE | 02 /
Mikolajick, Thomas Liebigstr. 18 01069 Dresden / DE | 03 /
Ludwig, Christoph Nicodéstrasse 17 01465 Langebrück / DE | 04 /
Schulze, Norbert Winzerstr. 82B 01445 Radebeul / DE | 05 /
Kuesters, Karl-Heinz Am Haideberg 16 01468 Boxdorf / DE | [2007/08] |
Former [2006/35] | 01 /
Willer, Josef Friedrich-Fröbel-Str. 62 85521 Riemerling / DE | ||
02 /
Mikolajick, Thomas Liebigstr. 18 01069 Dresden / DE | |||
03 /
Ludwig, Christoph Bergerstr. 15 01465 Langebrück / DE | |||
04 /
Schulze, Norbert Winzerstr. 82B 01445 Radebeul / DE | |||
05 /
Kuesters, Karl-Heinz Am Haideberg 16 01468 Boxdorf / DE | Representative(s) | Kottmann, Heinz Dieter Müller Hoffmann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB St.-Martin-Strasse 58 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/35] | Kottmann, Heinz Dieter Patentanwälte MÜLLER & HOFFMANN, Innere Wiener Strasse 17 81667 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06101622.6 | 14.02.2006 | [2006/35] | Priority number, date | US20050067983 | 28.02.2005 Original published format: US 67983 | [2006/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1696491 | Date: | 30.08.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.06.2006 | Classification | IPC: | H01L29/792, H01L29/423 | [2006/35] | CPC: |
H01L29/42336 (EP,KR,US);
H10B43/30 (EP,KR,US);
H01L29/7923 (EP,KR,US);
H10B69/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2007/19] |
Former [2006/35] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Nichtflüchtiger Speicher und Verfahren zu deren Herstellung | [2006/35] | English: | Non volatile memory and fabrication method thereof | [2006/35] | French: | Mémoire non volatile et sa méthode de fabrication | [2006/35] | Examination procedure | 09.02.2007 | Examination requested [2007/12] | 12.03.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.08.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.09.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/12] | 15.10.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2010/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2009 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2004026745 (ITOH YASUYOSHI [JP], et al); | [Y]US2004262665 (IWATA HIROSHI [JP], et al) |