EP1741889 - Exhaust treatment device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.02.2009 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.02.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 25.03.2009 [2009/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [2007/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Woerz, Stefan Rampacherstr. 10 71665 Vaihingen/Enz / DE | 02 /
Genssle, Andreas Steinstr. 6 70771 Musberg / DE | 03 /
Fuchs, Christian Rudolfstr. 14 70190 Stuttgart / DE | [2007/02] | Application number, filing date | 06110031.9 | 16.02.2006 | [2007/02] | Priority number, date | DE20051029835 | 27.06.2005 Original published format: DE102005029835 | [2007/02] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1741889 | Date: | 10.01.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1741889 | Date: | 16.04.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.09.2006 | Classification | IPC: | F01N3/20, F01N3/34 | [2007/02] | CPC: |
F01N3/2066 (EP);
B01F23/19 (EP);
B01F25/32 (EP);
F01N13/009 (EP);
F01N3/34 (EP);
F01N2240/20 (EP);
F01N2240/25 (EP);
F01N2470/30 (EP);
F01N2610/02 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2007/37] |
Former [2007/02] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Abgasbehandlungseinrichtung | [2007/02] | English: | Exhaust treatment device | [2007/02] | French: | Dispositif de traitement de gaz d'échappement | [2007/02] | Examination procedure | 01.12.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.07.2007 | Examination requested [2007/34] | 27.08.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.12.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 13.12.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.01.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE19938359 (AUDI AG [DE]) [X] 1-3 * abstract *; | [X]US2003159663 (ZAGAJA JOHN [US], et al) [X] 1-3 * abstract *; | [X]US5738184 (MASUDA ISAO [JP], et al) [X] 1-3 * abstract *; | [A]JPS59126016 ; | [A]JP2002256850 ; | [A]GB995835 (ALLIS CHALMERS MFG CO) [A] 1 * figure 1; claim 1 *; | [A]DE3320688 (ADL INNOVATION [SE]) [A] 1 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19841115), vol. 008, no. 249, Database accession no. (M - 338), & JP59126016 A 19840720 (ISUZU JIDOSHA KK) [A] 1 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20030114), vol. 2003, no. 01, & JP2002256850 A 20020911 (DENSO CORP) [A] 1-3 * abstract * |