EP1695606 - Process for the optimisation and adjustment of scattering, scattering machine and corresponding computer programm [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.07.2010 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.03.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE | published on 20.04.2011 [2011/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SULKY-BUREL S.A.S Rue Fabien Burel 35220 Châteaubourg / FR | For all designated states CEMAGREF (Centre National du Machinisme Agricole du Génie Rural, des Eaux et des Forêts) Parc de Tourvoie 92163 Antony Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2006/35] | For all designated states SULKY-BUREL S.A.S Rue Fabien Burel 35220 Chateaubourg / FR | ||
For all designated states CEMAGREF (Centre National du Machinisme Agricole du Génie Rural, des Eaux et des Forêts) Parc de Tourvoie 92163 Antony Cedex / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEVEILLE, Lionel 4 Le Clos de la Menillière 35220, SAINT-DIDIER / FR | 02 /
PIRON, Emmanuel 28 rue de la Corre 03300, CREUZIER LE VIEUX / FR | [2006/35] | Representative(s) | Bioret, Ludovic Cabinet Vidon 16 B, rue de Jouanet - B.P. 90333 35703 Rennes Cedex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2006/35] | Bioret, Ludovic Cabinet Vidon 16 B, rue de Jouanet - B.P. 90333 35703 Rennes Cedex 07 / FR | Application number, filing date | 06110133.3 | 17.02.2006 | [2006/35] | Priority number, date | FR20050001975 | 25.02.2005 Original published format: FR 0501975 | [2006/35] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1695606 | Date: | 30.08.2006 | Language: | FR | [2006/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1695606 | Date: | 23.09.2009 | Language: | FR | [2009/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.06.2006 | Classification | IPC: | A01B79/00 | [2006/35] | CPC: |
A01B79/005 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, DK, GB, NL [2007/19] |
Former [2006/35] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Optimierung und Einstellung des Streuens, zugehörige Streuer und Computerprogramm | [2006/35] | English: | Process for the optimisation and adjustment of scattering, scattering machine and corresponding computer programm | [2006/35] | French: | Procédé d'optimisation et d'adjustement de l'épandage, machine d'épandage et programme d'ordinateur correspondants | [2006/35] | Examination procedure | 24.11.2006 | Examination requested [2007/02] | 05.01.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.03.2007 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 26.05.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.06.2007 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BG, CH, CY, CZ, EE, ES, FI, FR, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 22.04.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.08.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.02.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.06.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 22.06.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.06.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 04.04.2007 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 04.04.2007 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 04.04.2007 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 04.04.2007 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 04.04.2007 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 04.04.2007 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 04.04.2007 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 04.04.2007 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 04.04.2007 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 04.04.2007 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 04.04.2007 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 04.04.2007 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 04.04.2007 | IS   M01   Not yet paid | 04.04.2007 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 04.04.2007 | LT   M01   Not yet paid | 04.04.2007 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 04.04.2007 | LV   M01   Not yet paid | 04.04.2007 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 04.04.2007 | PL   M01   Not yet paid | 04.04.2007 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 04.04.2007 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 04.04.2007 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 04.04.2007 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 04.04.2007 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 04.04.2007 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | DK | 23.09.2009 | NL | 23.09.2009 | BE | 28.02.2010 | [2011/16] |
Former [2010/41] | DK | 23.09.2009 | |
NL | 23.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/33] | NL | 23.09.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [XD]EP0917816 (AMAZONEN WERKE DREYER H [DE]) [XD] 1-3,16,18,19,22-25 * abstract * * paragraphs [0014] , [0015]; figures 1-4 *; | [Y]FR2772550 (RAUCH LANDMASCHFAB GMBH [DE]) [Y] 1-3,16,18,19,22-25 * figures 1-7 *; | [Y]DE19835487 (AMAZONEN WERKE DREYER H [DE]) [Y] 1-3,16,18,19,22-25* columns 1-2; figure 3 *; | [YD]EP1402766 (AMAZONEN WERKE DREYER H [DE]) [YD] 1-3,16,18,19,22-25 * abstract * |