EP1820817 - Polymer film resistant to biodiesel [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.01.2009 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.01.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.02.2009 [2009/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sika Technology AG Zugerstrasse 50 6340 Baar / CH | [2007/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Klaar, Karlo Hannoversche Strasse 29 53844, Troisdorf / DE | 02 /
Guyer, Peter Allmend 17 3366, Bollodingen / CH | 03 /
Slongo, Mario Sägetrainweg 6 1712, Tafers / CH | [2007/34] | Application number, filing date | 06110172.1 | 20.02.2006 | [2007/34] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1820817 | Date: | 22.08.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.08.2006 | Classification | IPC: | C08J5/18, C08L27/06, B60K15/03 | [2007/34] | CPC: |
B60K15/03 (EP);
C08L27/06 (EP);
C08L79/00 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C08L27/06, C08L2666/20 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/34] | Title | German: | Biodieselölbeständige Kunststofffolie | [2007/34] | English: | Polymer film resistant to biodiesel | [2007/34] | French: | Film polymère résistant au biodiesel | [2007/34] | Examination procedure | 22.02.2008 | Examination requested [2008/15] | 01.04.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.08.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/08] | 17.09.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2009/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB1270836 (ELASTOMER AG [CH]) [X] 8,11-13 * page 4, line 83 - page 4, line 86; example 1; claim 1 *; | [X]CA980487 (UNIROYAL LTD) [X] 8,11-13 * claims 1,12 *; | [X]DE3737553 (GOEPPINGER KALIKO GMBH [DE]) [X] 8,9,11,16* column 1, line 54 - column 2, line 8; claim 1 *; | [X]DE4031297 (NIPPON SYNTHETIC CHEM IND [JP], et al) [X] 8,11-13 * page 4, line 55 - page 4, line 67; claim 1 *; | [X]US5096756 (WALTERS PETER J [US]) [X] 8,12-14 * claims 1-3 *; | [XA]US5547741 (WILSON GARY J [GB]) [X] 8,11-13 * column 5, line 17 - column 5, line 26; claim 1 * * the whole document * [A] 1-7,10,15 |