Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
18.03.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 20.04.2011 [2011/16] |
27.11.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 30.12.2009 [2009/53] |
19.12.2008 | (Expected) grant | published on 21.01.2009 [2009/04] |
05.06.2008 | New entry: Payment of fee for grant | |
05.06.2008 | New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing | |
08.04.2008 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
31.01.2008 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | |
30.10.2007 | New entry: Loss of particular rights: legal effect | |
12.10.2007 | New entry: Reply to examination report | |
10.08.2007 | Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit | |
13.07.2007 | New entry: Loss of particular rights: despatch of communication + time limit | |
27.04.2007 | New entry: Period of grace R.85a / R.108(3) EPC1973: despatch of communication + time limit | |
27.04.2007 | Definitive list of designations | published on 30.05.2007 [2007/22] |
13.04.2007 | First examination report | |
11.04.2007 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | |
23.03.2007 | Request for examination filed | published on 25.04.2007 [2007/17] |
25.08.2006 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 27.09.2006 [2006/39] |