Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8131450 | Global Dossier | 06.03.2012 | B2 | US2011218727 | 08.09.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201113109027 | 17.05.2011 | US20264608 | 02.09.2008 | US36816906 | 03.03.2006 | EP05425121 | 04.03.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7962272 | Global Dossier | 14.06.2011 | B2 | US2009005953 | 01.01.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US20264608 | 02.09.2008 | US36816906 | 03.03.2006 | EP05425121 | 04.03.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7287525 | Global Dossier | 30.10.2007 | B2 | US2006235604 | 19.10.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP06110560 | 01.03.2006 | EP05425121 | 04.03.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7251990 | Global Dossier | 07.08.2007 | B2 | US2006230821 | 19.10.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP05425121 | 04.03.2005 | EP06110565 | 01.03.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7299123 | Global Dossier | 20.11.2007 | B2 | US2006225710 | 12.10.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP06110557 | 01.03.2006 | EP05425121 | 04.03.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1705359 | Global Dossier | 08.01.2014 | B1 | EP1705359 | 27.09.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP06110560 | 01.03.2006 | EP05425121 | 04.03.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1705353 | Global Dossier | 22.08.2012 | B1 | EP1705353 | 27.09.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP06110557 | 01.03.2006 | EP05425121 | 04.03.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1705357 | Global Dossier | 21.01.2009 | B1 | EP1705357 | 27.09.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP05425121 | 04.03.2005 | EP06110565 | 01.03.2006 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7440839 | Global Dossier | 21.10.2008 | B2 | US2006212209 | 21.09.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP05425121 | 04.03.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2275946 | Global Dossier | 19.01.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP05425121 | 04.03.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1705352 | Global Dossier | 21.11.2012 | B1 | EP1705352 | 27.09.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP05425121 | 04.03.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE602006004907D1 | 12.03.2009 | D1 | Priority number | Date | EP05425121 | 04.03.2005 |