EP1700886 - Blends of diene rubber with thermoplastic copolymer modified with nitrile rubber [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.11.2007 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.11.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.12.2007 [2007/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ZEON CHEMICALS L.P. 4111 Bells Lane Louisville KY 40233 / US | [2006/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gozdiff, Michael 1018 Lynbrook street, S.E North Canton OH 44720 / US | 02 /
Gettelfinger, Thomas 208 Pawnee Drive Jeffersonville IN 47130 / US | [2006/37] | Representative(s) | Portal, Gérard, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2006/37] | Portal, Gérard, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | Application number, filing date | 06110813.0 | 08.03.2006 | [2006/37] | Priority number, date | US20050073760 | 08.03.2005 Original published format: US 73760 | [2006/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1700886 | Date: | 13.09.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.07.2006 | Classification | IPC: | C08L21/00, C08L51/04 | [2006/37] | CPC: |
C08L23/0892 (EP,US);
C08L13/00 (EP,US);
C08L15/005 (EP,US);
C08L21/00 (EP,US);
C08L51/04 (EP,US);
C08L55/02 (EP,US);
C08L9/02 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C08L13/00, C08L2666/24 (US,EP);
C08L15/005, C08L2666/24 (US,EP);
C08L21/00, C08L2666/24 (US,EP);
C08L23/0892, C08L2666/06 (EP,US);
C08L51/04, C08L2666/02 (EP,US);
C08L51/04, C08L2666/04 (EP,US); | Designated contracting states | [2007/20] |
Former [2006/37] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Mischungen von Dienkautschuken mit nitrilkautschukmodifizierten thermoplastischen Copolymeren | [2006/37] | English: | Blends of diene rubber with thermoplastic copolymer modified with nitrile rubber | [2006/37] | French: | Mélanges de caoutchoucs de diènes avec des copolymères thermoplastiques modifiés par un caoutchouc nitrile | [2006/37] | Examination procedure | 14.03.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/49] | 20.07.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2007/49] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 03.05.2007 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 03.05.2007 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 03.05.2007 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 03.05.2007 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 03.05.2007 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 03.05.2007 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 03.05.2007 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 03.05.2007 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 03.05.2007 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 03.05.2007 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 03.05.2007 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 03.05.2007 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 03.05.2007 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 03.05.2007 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 03.05.2007 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 03.05.2007 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 03.05.2007 | IS   M01   Not yet paid | 03.05.2007 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 03.05.2007 | LT   M01   Not yet paid | 03.05.2007 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 03.05.2007 | LV   M01   Not yet paid | 03.05.2007 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 03.05.2007 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 03.05.2007 | PL   M01   Not yet paid | 03.05.2007 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 03.05.2007 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 03.05.2007 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 03.05.2007 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 03.05.2007 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 03.05.2007 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 03.05.2007 | M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US3914337 (GIDDINGS BRANDFORD E, et al) [Y] 1-20 * column A; example 1; claim - *; | [Y]EP0785233 (ZEON CHEMICALS INC [US]) [Y] 1-20 * abstract *; | [A]EP1038917 (ZEON CHEMICALS LP [US]) [A] 1* abstract * | by applicant | US3426102 |