EP1703212 - Door-lock device for a household appliance, in particular an oven [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.08.2012 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.08.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 12.09.2012 [2012/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ELTEK S.p.A. Str. Valenza 5/A I-15033 Casale Monferrato (Alessandria) / IT | [2006/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GAJ, Renato Via Cattaneo, 6 15033, Casale Monferrato (Alessandria) / IT | 02 /
MORO, Marco Via Colma, 18 15030, S. Maurizio di Conzano (Alessandria) / IT | [2011/38] |
Former [2006/38] | 01 /
GAJ, Renato Via Cattaneo, 6 15033, Casale Monferrato (Alessandria) / IT | ||
02 /
MORO, Marco Via Colma, 18 15030, S. Maurizio di Conzano (Alessand / IT | Representative(s) | Gallarotti, Franco Buzzi, Notaro & Antonielli d'Oulx S.p.A. Corso Vittorio Emanuele ll, 6 10123 Torino / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2011/40] | Gallarotti, Franco Buzzi, Notaro & Antonielli d'Oulx Via Maria Vittoria, 18 10123 Torino / IT | ||
Former [2006/38] | Gallarotti, Franco Buzzi, Notaro & Antonielli d'Oulx Srl, Via Maria Vittoria, 18 10123 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 06111213.2 | 15.03.2006 | [2006/38] | Priority number, date | IT2005TO00177 | 17.03.2005 Original published format: IT TO20050177 | [2006/38] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1703212 | Date: | 20.09.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/38] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1703212 | Date: | 10.10.2007 | [2007/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1703212 | Date: | 05.10.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.09.2007 | Classification | IPC: | F24C15/02, E05B47/00 | [2006/38] | CPC: |
F24C15/022 (EP);
E05B47/0012 (EP);
E05B2047/0057 (EP);
E05B2047/0067 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, PL, TR [2008/25] |
Former [2006/38] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Türschlossvorrichtung für ein Haushaltsgerät, insbesondere Backofen | [2011/19] | English: | Door-lock device for a household appliance, in particular an oven | [2006/38] | French: | Dispositif de verrouillage de porte pour appareil ménager, en particulier four de cuisson | [2006/38] |
Former [2006/38] | Türschlossvorrichtung für Haushaltsgerät, insbesondere Backofen | Examination procedure | 10.03.2008 | Examination requested [2008/17] | 11.04.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 24.04.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.05.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK | 30.10.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.11.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.05.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.06.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.01.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.09.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.03.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.04.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.08.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 16.08.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP10183110.5 / EP2282125 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.04.2008 | Opposition(s) | 06.07.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4554907 (OVERLEY RONALD V [US], et al) [A] 1,5 * page 4, paragraph 3 *; | [X]US4927996 (GENBAUFFE FRANCIS S [US], et al) [X] 1-13,15,17-20 * column 4, paragraph 3 - page 24, paragraph 3; figures 2,3,5,6,12 *; | [X]DE19846863 (BSH BOSCH SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE [DE]) [X] 1,2,5-8,10-13,15-20 * column 2, paragraph 3; figures 1,2 *; | [X]DE20320530U (ELLENBERGER & POENSGEN [DE]) [X] 1-11,17-20 * paragraphs [0003] , [0033]; figures 3-9 *; | [E]EP1640493 (ELTEK SPA [IT]) [E] 1-20* the whole document *; | [E]WO2006066646 (ELLENBERGER & POENSGEN [DE], et al) [E] 1-20 * the whole document * | by applicant | EP0977104 | DE19846863 | EP1640493 | WO2006066646 |